California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:19-cv-02288
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2019
Re-opened:Jun 21, 2021
Terminated:Apr 20, 2020
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2020 3:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Alex Padilla
Represented By
Lara Haddad
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Creighton Meland
Represented By
Anastasia P. Boden
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Daniel M. Ortner
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua Paul Thompson
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2020
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/20/2020 GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss, DISMISSING the suit without prejudice for lack of standing. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
GPO Aug 18 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/17/2021 GRANTING 26 Motion for extension to time. Motion for Preliminary Injunction 23 Hearing Reset for 10/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Defendants response to motion due by 9/21/2021, and Replies due by 10/12/2021.(Reader, L)
GPO Sep 08 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/7/2021 GRANTING 30 Motion for Extension of Time. By 9/28/2021, Defendant Secretary Weber shall file her response to Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Oct 01 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/30/2021 GRANTING 36 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERD that an amicus brief by California Women Lawyers should be filed by 10/8/2021. (Tupolo, A)
GPO Oct 13 2021
ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/12/2021. The submitted amicus brief, Document No. 43, is considered filed in this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Oct 18 2021
[STRICKEN - see 56 Minute Order] ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/2021 GRANTING 54 Motion to Strike; STRIKING 46 Supplemental Declaration of Plaintiff Creighton Meland, Jr. in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction from the record; SUSTAINING defendant Secretary of State's evidentiary objections to portions of plaintiff's supplemental declaration, specifically, Paragraphs 6, 17, and 21, and the second and last sentences in Paragraph 7, and STRIKING them from the record; and STRIKING the arguments at 14:2-5 and 14:6-12 of 46 Reply in Support of his Motion for Preliminary Injunction from the record. Plaintiff may not rely on the foregoing to support his Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Michel, G.) Modified on 10/18/2021 (Michel, G.).
GPO Oct 26 2021
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/25/2021 ORDERING cases 2:19-cv-2288 JAM AC, Meland v. Weber and 2:21-cv-1951 KJM CKD Alliance for Fair Board Recruitment v. Weber are hereby RELATED. (Donati, J)
GPO Dec 21 2021
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/20/2021 REASSIGNING Case 2:21-CV-02168 KJM-DBto District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. And any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are VACATED. The caption on documents filed in this REASSIGNED case shall be shown as 2:21-CV-02168 JAM-AC. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Dec 27 2022
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/27/21 DENYING 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Plummer, M)
GPO Mar 24 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2022 ORDERING Opposition to 77 Motion to Stay due by 3/25/2022, and Reply due by 4/4/2022. (Huang, H)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, July 17, 2023
95 95 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/17 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Shirley N. Weber. (Carrillo, Sophia)
Related: [-]