Original Case: 2:19-cv-02288

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-15207
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2022
Terminated:Feb 18, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 22, 2022 12:26 AM PST
Defendant - Appellant
SHIRLEY WEBER, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of the State of California
Represented By
Lisa Janine Cisneros
AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Lara Haddad
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Julia Harumi Mass
California Department of Justice
contact info
Marisol Leon
California Department of Justice
contact info
Delbert Tran
California Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CREIGHTON MELAND
Represented By
Anastasia P. Boden
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Daniel Ortner
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua Paul Thompson
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/22/2022 12:23 AM PST
Thursday, February 10, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Cross Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12366348] 22-15207 22-15149 (RT) [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:46 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 2 pgs Cross Appeal Chart
Att: 4 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 5 2 pgs Mediaiton Questionnaire
Att: 6 22 pgs Case Opening Packet