New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anne M Nardacci
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:19-cv-01409
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2019
Re-opened:Jan 24, 2025
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2020 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Andrew M. Cuomo
Represented By
Adrienne J. Kerwin
Office Of Attorney General - Albany
contact info
Defendant
Letitia James
Represented By
Adrienne J. Kerwin
Office Of Attorney General - Albany
contact info
Defendant
Roberta Reardon
Represented By
Adrienne J. Kerwin
Office Of Attorney General - Albany
contact info
Plaintiff
CompassCare
Represented By
Kenneth Connelly
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
James P. Trainor
Cutler, Trainor Law Firm
contact info
David A. Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom - Ga Office
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff
First Bible Baptist Church
Represented By
Kenneth Connelly
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
James P. Trainor
Cutler, Trainor Law Firm
contact info
David A. Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom - Ga Office
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff
National Institute of Family and Life Advocates
Represented By
Kenneth Connelly
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
James P. Trainor
Cutler, Trainor Law Firm
contact info
David A. Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom - Ga Office
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2020
DECISION & ORDER - That Plaintiffs' 17 motion for preliminary injunction is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED with respect to the "notice" provision in New York Labor Law § 203-e(6). That provision of the statute may not be enforced against any employer. The Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED in all other respects. The Defendants' 19 motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as follows. The motion is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs' free speech claim as it relates to the notice provision in Section 203-e(6). The motion is GRANTED in all other respects. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 6/5/2020. (jel, )

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
73 73 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/02 12:26 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Anne M. Nardacci on 4/2/2025. (mab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
72 72 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/26 7:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates submitted to Judge Anne M. Nardacci. (Theriot, Kevin)
Related: [-]