Original Case: 1:19-cv-01409

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-01076
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 13, 2022
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 3:42 AM EST
Amicus Curiae
American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By
Aditi Fruitwala
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arijeet Sensharma
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Gabriella Larios
New York Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Amicus Curiae
New York Civil Liberties Union
Represented By
Aditi Fruitwala
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arijeet Sensharma
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Gabriella Larios
New York Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Kathy Hochul, in her official capacity as the Govenor of the State of New York
Represented By
Andrea Oser
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Laura Etlinger
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Roberta Reardon, in her official capacity as the Commissioner of the Labor Department of the State of New York
Represented By
Andrea Oser
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Laura Etlinger
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Letitia James, in her official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By
Andrea Oser
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Laura Etlinger
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CompassCare, a New York nonprofit corporation
Represented By
David Andrew Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
James P. Trainor
Trainor Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Caleb Dalton
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, DBA NIFLA, a Virginia corporation
Represented By
David Andrew Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
James P. Trainor
Trainor Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Caleb Dalton
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
First Bible Baptist Church, a New York nonprofit corporation
Represented By
David Andrew Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
James P. Trainor
Trainor Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Caleb Dalton
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info

GPO Jan 02 2025
OPINION, affirming in part, vacating in part and remanding for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, by BDP, MP, SALM, FILED.[3638984] [22-951, 22-1076]

Docket last updated: 01/03/2025 3:18 AM EST
Friday, May 13, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Roberta Reardon, FILED. [3314856] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:27 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Roberta Reardon, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5902976, FILED.[3314862] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:30 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/01/2022, RECEIVED.[3314865] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:31 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3314867] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:32 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 1 pgs CAPTION, to reflect party designation changes in re: cross appeal, AMENDED.[3314879] [22-951, 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:41 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTE: See lead case, 22-951, containing complete set of docket entries.[3314883] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:44 PM]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Roberta Reardon, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF. [3314975] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:39 PM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY, Laura Etlinger, [7], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[3315088] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:44 PM]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church and National Institute of Family and Life Advocates in 22-951, Appellee CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church and National Institute of Family and Life Advocates in 22-1076 FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF. [3315109] [22-951, 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:04 PM]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Roberta Reardon, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3315117] 22-1076 [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:20 PM]
Related: [-]