Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-36444

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-bk-36440
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2019
Terminated:Mar 08, 2022

TypePartnership
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Approach Resources I, LP
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Friday, March 11, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/12 7:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Final Decree
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
7 7 order Final Decree (No Form) Wed 03/09 7:14 AM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case, Signed on 3/8/2022 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
6 6 motion Final Decree Mon 02/14 3:00 PM
Motion for Final Decree Filed by Liquidator Allison D. Byman (Liggins, Demetra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2019
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 11/22 2:20 PM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Filed By Approach Resources I, LP ). (Bennett, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/22 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Joint Administration
Monday, November 18, 2019
3 3 order Joint Administration Mon 11/18 9:51 PM
Order for Joint Administration Signed on 11/18/2019 (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Emergency Motion Mon 11/18 5:59 PM
Emergency Motion Emergency Motion of Debtors for Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor Approach Resources I, LP Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Bennett, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order
1 1 32 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 11/18 3:16 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Approach Resources I, LP. (Bennett, David)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 11/18 9:51 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 19-36444 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 11/18 3:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-36440 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21643621. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]