Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-bk-36444
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2019
Terminated:Oct 22, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Dec 16, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Approach Resources Inc.
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Debtor
Approach Resources I, LP
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Debtor
Approach Operating, LLC
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Debtor
Approach Midstream Holdings LLC
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Debtor
Approach Oil & Gas Inc.
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Debtor
Approach Delaware, LLC
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Debtor
Approach Services, LLC
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178
Represented By
David Mark Bennett
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


1. Approach Resources Files for Chapter 11 (rigzone.com)
Submitted Thu 11/21/2019
Docket last updated: 23 seconds ago
Thursday, October 31, 2024
836 836 notice Notice Thu 10/31 3:49 PM
Notice of Final Distributions . Filed by Allison D. Byman (Byman, Allison)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
835 835 misc Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Fri 10/25 4:34 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 10/25/2024 (Filed By Allison D. Byman ). (Byman, Allison)
Related: [-]
834 834 misc Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Fri 10/25 4:31 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 9/30/2024 (Filed By Allison D. Byman ). (Byman, Allison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
833 833 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/24 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 10/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 832 Final Decree