Approach Delaware, LLC Jointly Administered under 19-36444.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-36444
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-36444
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-bk-36450 |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Approach Delaware, LLC
6500 West Fwy Ste 800
Fort Worth, TX 76116-2178 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case, Signed on 3/8/2022 (TylerLaws) |
|
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion for Final Decree Filed by Liquidator Allison Byman (Liggins, Demetra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Filed By Approach Delaware, LLC ). (Bennett, David) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/21/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order for Joint Administration Signed on 11/18/2019 (LinhthuDoadi) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Emergency Motion Emergency Motion of Debtors for Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor Approach Delaware, LLC Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Bennett, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Approach Delaware, LLC. (Bennett, David) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Mon 11/18 9:58 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 19-36444 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi) |
||
crditcrd
none
Mon 11/18 5:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-36450 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21644644. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |