Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-50861

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:19-ap-05073
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2019
Terminated:Mar 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Martin Alvarado, Defendant
P. O. Box 4919
Hidalgo, TX 78557
Represented By
Martin Alvarado
contact info
Plaintiff
Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC, Plaintiff
8700 Crownhill Blvd. #105
San Antonio, TX 78209
Represented By
Martin Warren Seidler
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/04 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Default Judgment against Martin Alvarado, who is terminated from case. (related document(s):16 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 3/2/2020)
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/03 10:25 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
19 19 order AP-Default Judgment (PDF) Mon 03/02 2:53 PM
Default Judgment against Martin Alvarado, who is terminated from case. Related [+] (Order entered on 3/2/2020) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 16 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Mon 03/02 2:50 PM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED***. . Related [+] (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 16 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Friday, February 07, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/07 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):16 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Hearing Scheduled For 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
17 17 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Wed 02/05 8:34 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 16 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Thursday, January 30, 2020
16 16 motion Default Judgment Thu 01/30 10:17 AM
Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2020
15 15 court Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public) Thu 01/16 3:43 PM
Court Entry: NOTICE OF UNDELIVERABLE ADDRESS FOR MARTIN ALVARADO re: # 10. (Carouth, Christy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/11 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Clerk's Entry of Default against Martin Alvarado
Thursday, January 09, 2020
13 13 court Clerk's Entry of Default (F) Thu 01/09 12:18 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Martin Alvarado (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
12 12 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 01/08 5:19 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to Martin Alvarado filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Clerk's entry of default
Sunday, January 05, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/05 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Dismissing Document for Lack of Compliance (related document(s):8 Motion For Default Judgment against Martin Avarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Clerk's entry of default)) (Order entered on 1/3/2020)
Friday, January 03, 2020
10 10 order Dismissing Pleading for Lack of Compliance (pdf) Fri 01/03 10:49 AM
Order Dismissing Document for Lack of Compliance Related [+] (Order entered on 1/3/2020) (Carouth, Christy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion For Default Judgment against Martin Avarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Clerk's entry of default)
Wednesday, January 01, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/01 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Dismissing Document for Lack of Compliance (related document(s):6 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC.) (Order entered on 12/30/2019)
Monday, December 30, 2019
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/30 3:35 PM
Motion For Default Judgment against Martin Avarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Clerk's entry of default
7 7 order Dismissing Pleading for Lack of Compliance (pdf) Mon 12/30 12:36 PM
Order Dismissing Document for Lack of Compliance Related [+] (Order entered on 12/30/2019) (Kanyumbu, Terrance)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC.
Monday, December 23, 2019
6 6 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/23 3:23 PM
Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Martin Alvarado Filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC. (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
5 5 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 12/13 1:53 PM
Summons Served on Martin Alvarado - served on 11/19/2019 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
4 4 order AP-Obtain Summons Service (F) Thu 12/12 10:58 AM
Order to Obtain Summons Service on Martin Alvarado (Order entered on 12/12/2019) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Tue 11/19 3:12 PM
Summons Issued on Martin Alvarado Answer Due 12/19/2019 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 11/19 3:10 PM
Summons Issued on Martin Alvarado Answer Due 12/19/2019 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 3:10 PM
Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Turnover, Breach of Fiduciary Duties and Other Relief Against Former Owner of Debtor-in-Possession and to Recover Damages Pursuant to Applicable Law filed by Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC (attorneys Martin Warren Seidler, Martin Warren Seidler) against Martin Alvarado (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Seidler, Martin) Modified on 11/20/2019 (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet