Black Diamond Commercial Finance, L.L.C. v. Murray Energy Corporation et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-02143 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Murray Energy Corporation
46226 National Road
St. Clairsville, OH 43950 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Murray Energy Holdings Co.
46226 National Road
St. Clairsville, OH 43950 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
GLAS Trust Company LLC
10 Ferry Street 313
Concord, NH 03301 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Bank, NA
U.S. Bancorp Center 800 Nicollet Mall
Minneapolis, MN 55402 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Black Diamond Commercial Finance, L.L.C.
5330 Yacht Haven Grande #100
St. Thomas, VI 00802 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/04 3:03 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2143 Closed (2km) |
||
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
159 | 159
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Mon 02/28 2:49 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Stipulation of Dismissal) Filed by Plaintiff Black Diamond Commercial Finance, L.L.C., Defendants GLAS Trust Company LLC, Murray Energy Corporation, Murray Energy Holdings Co., US Bank, NA. (Crist, Tyson) |