Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:19-bk-13866
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Feb 18, 2021
Claims Deadline:Apr 19, 2021
Converted:Nov 24, 2020

Debtor
Solomon Acquisition Corp.
PO Box 189
Realization Services Inc
Bedford Hills, NY 10507-0189
Represented By
Steven J. Reisman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Stretto Claims Agent
8269 E. 23rd Avenue Suite 275 www.stretto.com
Denver, CO 80238
Trustee
Alan Nisselson
Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP 156 West 56th Street
New York, NY 10019
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 01/14/2025 4:44 PM EST
Thursday, December 05, 2019
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 12/05 8:07 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 19-13866 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13574544. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 12/05 8:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Steven J. Reisman of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP on behalf of Solomon Acquisition Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
2 2 17 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 12/05 8:22 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL AFFAIRS FOR SOLOMON ACQUISITION CORP. Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Solomon Acquisition Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
3 3 28 pgs misc Schedules Thu 12/05 8:29 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual SCHEDULES OF ASSETS AND LIABILITIES FOR SOLOMON ACQUISITION CORP. Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Solomon Acquisition Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven