Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12606

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:19-bk-12608
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2019
Terminated:Mar 31, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bee Line, Inc.
9503 East 33rd Street One Celadon Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46235
Represented By
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
7 7 order Dismissing Case - Claims Agent Wed 03/31 2:19 PM
Order (I) Approving Procedures for the Dismissal and Closing of These Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Dismissing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases; (III) Closing Each of These Chapter 11 Cases Effective as of March 31, 2021 as of 11:59 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time); and (IV) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 3/31/2021 (Mml)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/31 3:54 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (AJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 02/11 8:34 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Bee Line, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
5 5 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 12/10 4:09 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Celadon Group, Inc., Case No. 19-12606 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 19-12606 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] Signed on 12/10/2019 (Mml)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 crditcrd none Tue 12/10 11:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12608 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 92364, amount $1717.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
3 3 court Case Reassigned Mon 12/09 8:17 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (LB)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion Mon 12/09 1:37 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Bee Line, Inc. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 12/09 7:41 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 08, 2019
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 12/08 11:55 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Bee Line, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]