Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:19-bk-12606
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2019
Terminated:Mar 31, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Celadon Group, Inc.
9503 East 33rd Street One Celadon Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46235
Represented By
Richard A. Chesley
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Jeffrey S. Torosian
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Jamila Justine Willis
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 16, 2020 3:00 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.net 222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Mercedes Benz Financial Services
Represented By
Stephen B. Grow
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
Deloice Gillion
103 Louis Drive
Parkin, AR 72373
Represented By
Mark Norman Geller
Nahon Saharovich & Trotz, PLC
contact info
Carl D. Neff
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Creditor
TA Dispatch, LLC
Represented By
Ann E. Pille
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Jason Daniel Angelo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. d/b/a GE Appliances
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alex Henderson
Represented By
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Park Stanley
142 Church St. P.O. Box 101
New Milford, PA 18834
Creditor
Larry D. Jones
Represented By
Charles A. Ercole
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg
contact info
Creditor
K.R. Drenth Trucking, Inc. d/b/a KRD Trucking
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Elizabeth B Vandesteeg
Sugar Felsenthal Grais & Hammer LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jodee Shenyer
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Laredo College
Represented By
George R. Meurer
contact info
Creditor
Sese Logistics US, LLC
Represented By
GianClaudio Finizio
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Zorada Scoppa
Represented By
Vivian A. Houghton
Law Office Of Vivian A. Houghton, Inc.
contact info
Creditor
SunTrust Equipment Finance & Leasing Corp.
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Valerie K. Richmond
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Paul G. Durdaller
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Mercedes-Benz Financial Service USA LLC
Represented By
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
MidCap Funding IV Trust
Represented By
Paige Noelle Topper
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnel
contact info
David Ernest Morrison
Goldberg Kohn Bell Black
contact info
Matthew B. Harvey
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Eric D. Schwartz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Danielle Wildern Juhle
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Carol Nichols
Represented By
Christopher Dean Loizides
Loizides, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Loran Nichols
Represented By
Christopher Dean Loizides
Loizides, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
BLANK ROME LLP 1201 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Regina S. Kelbon
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sangar Cargo Security, Inc.
Represented By
James A. Timko
Shutts & Bowen LLP
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Francis Roell
Represented By
Ryan Johnson
Keller & Keller LLP
contact info
Creditor
RLF I-C SPE, LLC
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kirk Ray
Represented By
Theodore J. Tacconelli
Ferryjoseph, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Sheryl Ray
Stone, Leyton & Gershman, P.C. 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105
Represented By
Howard S. Smotkin
Stone, Leyton, & Gershman
contact info
Theodore J. Tacconelli
Ferryjoseph, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Regions Commercial Equipment Finance, LLC
Represented By
Mark R Wenzel
Smithamundsen LLC
contact info
Kevin G. Collins
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
David M. Powlen
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
Creditor
Nidia S. Rodriguez
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group 100 NE Loop 410, Ste. 615
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Chubb Companies
Represented By
Drew McGehrin
C/o Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Gary D. Bressler
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP
contact info
Michael Morano
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Robert W Miller
Manier & Herod PC
contact info
Michael E. Collins
contact info
Creditor
Nidia S Rodriguez
Represented By
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Melvin Shenyer
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
ACAR Leasing LTD d/b/a GM Financial Leasing
PO Box 183853
Arlington, TX 76096
Represented By
Kristi JoLynn Doughty
C/o Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
Creditor
WARN Act Plaintiffs
Represented By
Richard Michael Beck
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Sally E. Veghte
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
BANK OF AMERICA
Represented By
Stephen E. Gruendel
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
contact info
Charles R. Rayburn, III
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
contact info
Mary Caloway
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Creditor
BB&T Equipment Finance Corporation
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Valerie K. Richmond
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Paul G. Durdaller
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Dept of Justice Civil Division Commercial Litigation Branch P.O. Box 875 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20044
Represented By
Andrea Horowitz Handel
Dept Of Justice Civil Division
contact info
Creditor
Bromberg Properties, LLC
Represented By
Julia Bettina Klein
Klein LLC
contact info
Creditor
CAB East LLC
Represented By
Janet Z. Charlton
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Transport Enterprise Leasing, LLC
Represented By
Gianfranco Finizio
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Todd C. Meyers
contact info
John Gentile
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Creditor
Ford Motor Credit Company
Represented By
Janet Z. Charlton
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Kristi J. Doughty
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Creditor
The Huntington National Bank
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Ganz
Riemer & Braunstein LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alyson Clark
250 Warner Street Apt. 5
Cincinnati, OH 45219
Represented By
Ann M. Kashishian
Kashishian Law LLC
contact info
Creditor
Charles A. Ercole
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ell 260 S. Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Terminal Exchange Services, Inc.
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP 2005 MARKET STREET, SUITE 2600 Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP c/o Daniel Pereira
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ellis County
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Fwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Shervin Ebrahimi
Represented By
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
Texas Workforce Commission
Christopher S. Murphy c/o Sherri K. Simpson, Paralegal P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Christopher Murphy
Texas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
James Debois
Represented By
Ashley Bennett
Schueman Smith & Associates PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Comdata Inc.
Represented By
Kevin Scott Mann
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Sean Kirk
Bone Mcallester Norton PLLC
contact info
Joseph Grey
Cross & Simon LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Jay R. Indyke
Cooley LLP
contact info
Evan M. Lazerowitz
Cooley LLP
contact info
Robert Winning
Cooley LLP
contact info
Seth Van Aalten
Cooley LLP
contact info
Sarah Ann Carnes
Cooley LLP
contact info
David Ryan Slaugh
Potter Anderson & Corron LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Aaron H. Stulman
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
L. Katherine Good
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
AlixPartners, LLP
Financial Advisor
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.net 222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Interested Party
Union Pacific Railroad Company
1400 Douglas Street STOP 1580
Omaha, NE 68179
Interested Party
Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary
Interested Party
Stephen W. Lackey, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Isabelle R. Lackey, Deceased
Represented By
Brenna Anne Dolphin
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By
Kevin G. Collins
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Connie A. Lahn
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
David M. Powlen
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
Michael A Cavallaro
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Stephen W. Lackey
Represented By
Brenna Anne Dolphin
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin G. Collins
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Austin T. Pace
Represented By
Brenna Anne Dolphin
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
A&S Services Group, LLC
Represented By
Steven L. Caponi
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Jonathan M. Cohen
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Matthew Goeller
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Margaret R. Westbrook
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Emily Mather
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Tiffany Strelow Cobb
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Michael David DeBaecke
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Interested Party
Blue Torch Finance, LLC
Represented By
Adam C. Harris
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Abbey Walsh
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bridge Capital Leasing, Inc., a BankUnited Company
Represented By
Kevin J. Mangan
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CSC, a DXC Technology Company
Represented By
Tara L. Lattomus
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellot, LLC
contact info
Christopher Perkins
Eckert Seamans Cherin And Mellot
contact info
Interested Party
City National Bank of Florida
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
FCA US LLC
Represented By
Thomas G. Macauley
Macauley LLC
contact info
Interested Party
John Thomas Feeney, III
Feeney & Murray, P.C. 424 Church Street, Suite 2230, P.O. Box 198685
Nashville, TN 37219
Interested Party
Anthony Griffen
Represented By
Brenna Anne Dolphin
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Marchina Harrell
Represented By
Kathleen M. Miller
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Illinois National Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael S. Davis
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Interested Party
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Alan J. Brody
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates
Represented By
W. Austin Jowers
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Stephen M Blank
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Arthur J. Steinberg
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Interested Party
William "Eric" Meek
Represented By
Ted A. Dillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Drew T Gardiner
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Christopher J. Moser, Plan Trustee for Tango Transport, et al
Represented By
Tristan E Manthey
Heller Draper Patrick Horn & Manthey LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Bobby Lee Peavler
Represented By
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Scott Dickerson Lawrence
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Mediator
Kevin Gross
Rosenthal Monhait Gross & Goddess 919 Market Street, Suite 1401 P.O. Box 1070
Wilmington, DE 19899
Transcriber
EScribers, LLC
352 7th Avenue
New York, NY 10001
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Creditor
First Insurance Funding Corp.
Terminated: 03/05/2020
450 Skokie Blvd., Ste. 1000
Northbrook, IL 60062
Represented By
Thomas G. Macauley
Macauley LLC
contact info
Interested Party
South Carolina Department of Insurance
Terminated: 03/05/2020
P.O. Box 100105
Columbia, SC 29202
Represented By
Geoffrey Bonham
Sc Department Of Insurance
contact info
Interested Party
Anthony Lande
Terminated: 01/30/2020

Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, July 11, 2022
1612 1612 court Request for Transcript Mon 07/11 3:13 PM
Request for Transcript of hearing held on 05/05/2021 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC , Telephone number operations@escribers.net . (EScribers, LLC)
Related: [-]