Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12606

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:19-bk-12615
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2019
Terminated:Mar 31, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
9503 East 33rd Street One Celadon Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46235
Represented By
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/05 12:00 PM
Order Denying (I) Luminus Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case of Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. for the Limited Purpose of Considering Luminus Enforcement Motion and (II) Luminus Motion to Enforce Sale Order, Mexican SAPA and VAT Services Agreement Related [+] Order Signed on 5/5/2021. (CB)
Related: [-] 10 ,12
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
15 15 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 04/06 12:04 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service . Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 10 ,12 ,13
misc Add Attorney Tue 04/06 10:45 AM
Attorney Arthur J. Steinberg and William E. Chipman for Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates, Stephen Blank and William E. Chipman for Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates, Robert Nussbaum and William E. Chipman for Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates added to case Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 04/05 7:44 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Robert Nussbaum, Esquire of King & Spalding LLP . Receipt Number 3586228, Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Declaration in Support Mon 04/05 7:32 PM
Declaration in Support of Motion to Enforce Sale Order, Mexican SAPA and VAT Services Agreement Related [+] Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 motion Approve - Motion Mon 04/05 7:30 PM
Motion to Approve /Motion to Enforce Sale Order, Mexican SAPA and VAT Services Agreement Related [+] Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/28/2021. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice of Motion and Hearing
11 11 crditcrd none Mon 04/05 7:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case (B)([LINK 19-12615 KBO] ) [motion,mopen11] (1167.00). Receipt Number A10270673, amount $1167.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Reopen Chapter 11 Case - Motion Mon 04/05 7:23 PM
Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case for the Limited Purpose of Considering Luminus Enforcement Motion . Fee Amount $1167. Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/28/2021. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Enforcement Motion
Att: 3 Notice of Motion and Hearing
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
9 9 order Dismissing Case - Claims Agent Wed 03/31 2:19 PM
Order (I) Approving Procedures for the Dismissal and Closing of These Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Dismissing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases; (III) Closing Each of These Chapter 11 Cases Effective as of March 31, 2021 as of 11:59 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time); and (IV) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 3/31/2021 (Mml)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/31 4:06 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (AJL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 03/05 2:53 PM
Amendment To Initial Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, , . Filed by . (AJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 02/11 9:03 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs
Friday, December 27, 2019
6 6 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 12/27 4:30 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Abbey's Wrecker Service. (Downs, Jay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
5 5 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 12/10 4:09 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Celadon Group, Inc., Case No. 19-12606 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 19-12606 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] Signed on 12/10/2019 (Mml)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 crditcrd none Tue 12/10 11:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12615 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 92364, amount $1717.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
3 3 court Case Reassigned Mon 12/09 8:17 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (LB)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion Mon 12/09 1:40 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 12/09 12:17 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 12/09 7:41 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LB)
Related: [-]