Leasing Servicios, S.A. de C.V.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12606
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12606
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Karen B Owens |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-12620 |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2021 |
Type | Other Entity Type |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Leasing Servicios, S.A. de C.V.
9503 East 33rd Street One Celadon Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46235 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order (I) Approving Procedures for the Dismissal and Closing of These Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Dismissing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases; (III) Closing Each of These Chapter 11 Cases Effective as of March 31, 2021 as of 11:59 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time); and (IV) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 3/31/2021 (Mml) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 03/31 4:15 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (AJL) |
||
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Leasing Servicios, S.A. de C.V.. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Celadon Group, Inc., Case No. 19-12606 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 19-12606 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 12/10/2019 (Mml) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/10 11:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12620 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 92364, amount $1717.00. (COH) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 12/09 8:17 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (LB) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Leasing Servicios, S.A. de C.V. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Leasing Servicios, S.A. de C.V.. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 12/09 7:41 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LB) |