Samantha Venegas v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-10470 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 2:19-cv-02303 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 08, 2020 1:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Venegas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/07 2:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Tue 12/17 5:37 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Tue 12/17 12:48 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California.Electronic Records Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 12/17 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh) |
|
10 | 10
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Tue 12/17 5:33 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 32 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 12/03/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-02303-WBS-EFB from U.S. District Court Eastern District of California (Sacramento). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB (FFMx). (lh) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re4 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
4 | 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2020, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS), before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) MDL No. 2814-AB (FFMx) by Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS053694 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8569165) (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 12/17/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Hailey M. Rogerson, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Proof of Service |