Anthony Grant et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-10472 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2019 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:19-cv-07538 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 09, 2020 2:13 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Anthony Grant
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Caroline Grant
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/07 4:44 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 CONDITIONAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. IN RE: FORD MOTOR CO. DPS6 POWERSHIFT TRANSMISSION PORDUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2814. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 12/03/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
The United States District Court for the Central District of California shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re14 Order of Transfer (aaaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Wed 12/18 4:23 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (jtil) |
|
17 | 17
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Wed 12/18 4:18 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 32 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 12/3/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:19-cv-07538 from Northern District of California. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx). (jtil) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 12/18 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Wed 12/18 12:43 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 ERRONEOUSL E-FILED: PLEASE DISREGARD: JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/20/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/21/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
12 | 12 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE DISREGARD: ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/20/2019.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/21/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
11 | 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/20/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/19/19.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
9 | 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
7 | 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company..(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
6 | 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company re Electronic Filing Error,(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
5 | 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety as a separate entry on the docket . Re:[1-11] Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Ford Motor Company. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | ||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Jeannette Mrowka(Mrowka, Molly) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 19-CIV-06030. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13893705). Filed byFord Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) Modified on 11/18/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Of Spencer P. Hugret In Support Of Ford Motor Companys Notice Of Removal Of Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, 1446, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Of Molly J. Mrowka In Support Of Ford Motor Companys Notice Of Removal Of Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, 1446, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Copy of COMPLAINT attached - Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Copy of ANSWER attached - Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Defendant Ford Motor Companys Certification Of Interested Entities Or Persons, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 13 Certificate/Proof of Service |