Delaware District Court
Judge:Evan J Wallach
Case #: 1:19-cv-02300
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2019
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 16, 2020 4:41 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Dyax Corp.
Represented By
Chelsea A. Loughran
contact info
Stuart V.C. Duncan Smith
contact info
Kelly E. Farnan
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Michael N. Rader
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ares Trading S.A.
Represented By
Kevin J. Culligan
contact info
John Hintz
contact info
John G. Day
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
John Hanish
contact info
Counter Defendant
Merck Patent GmbH
Represented By
John G. Day
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Defendant
Dyax Corp.
Represented By
Chelsea A. Loughran
contact info
Stuart V.C. Duncan Smith
contact info
Kelly E. Farnan
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Michael N. Rader
contact info
Susmita A. Gadre
contact info
Plaintiff
Ares Trading S.A.
Represented By
Kevin J. Culligan
contact info
John Hintz
contact info
John G. Day
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
John Hanish
contact info

GPO Mar 10 2023
REDACTED VERSION of 266 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. Signed by Judge Evan J. Wallach on 2/21/2023. (twk)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
289 289 order Oral Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/18 8:26 AM
ORAL ORDER: The parties having stated they agree this matter may be closed. D.I.288 ; D.I. 286 and good cause appearing therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Evan J Wallach on 12/18/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
288 288 misc Letter Tue 12/17 2:56 PM
Letter to The Honorable Evan J. Wallach from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Follow up to November 15, 2024 Letter - re287 Letter. (Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]