Original Case: 1:19-cv-02300

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01487
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2023
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 11:56 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
DYAX CORP
Represented By
Ginger D. Anders
Munger Tolles & Olson
contact info
Nicole Pedi
Richards Layton & Finger
contact info
Michael N. Rader
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks
contact info
Chelsea A. Loughran
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks
contact info
Stuart D. Smith
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks
contact info
Suresh Rav
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks
contact info
Kelly E. Farnan
Richards Layton & Finger
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ARES TRADING SA
Represented By
John P. Hanish
Maynard Cooper & Gale
contact info
Thomas G. Saunders
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr
contact info
Seth P. Waxman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr
contact info
Kevin J. Culligan
Maynard Cooper & Gale
contact info
John G. Day
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Andrew C. Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
John M. Hintz
Maynard Cooper & Gale
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2024
ORDER AMENDING OPINION (Coram: KRAUSE, PORTER and CHUNG, Circuit Judges) Construing the parties’ submissions of August 26, 2024 as a motion for partial sealing, the motion is GRANTED. The publicly filed version of the Court’s opinion shall be redacted accordingly and such redacted information shall be maintained under seal for a period of seven years after the conclusion of the case. Krause, Authoring Judge.
GPO Sep 03 2024
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: KRAUSE, PORTER and CHUNG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 45. Authoring Judge: Porter

Docket last updated: 08/15/2024 11:56 AM EDT
Friday, March 24, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ares Trading SA in District Court No. 1-19-cv-02300. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 55 pgs District Court Order 031023
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 4 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
2 pgs ORDER (Clerk) It is noted that the memorandum order on appeal and other portions of this case are sealed in the District Court. Because it is sealed, the Clerk has not filed the District Court?s sealed memorandum order on this Court?s docket. Any party who wishes to continue the seal must file a motion pursuant to Third Circuit Local Appellate Rule 106.1(c)(2) within thirty (30) days of the date the notice of appeal was filed, or the seal will be lifted, and the memorandum order will be added to the docket without restriction. (KR)
Related: [-]