Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela Pepper
Case #: 2:19-cv-01863
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2019
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 16, 2020 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Fond du Lac School District
Represented By
Oyvind Wistrom
Lindner & Marsack Sc
contact info
Kristofor L Hanson
Lindner & Marsack Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Hagen
Represented By
William R Rettko
Rettko Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
44 44 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/24 3:26 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1688 re:40 Notice of Appeal filed by Michelle Hagen. (lmf)
Related: [-]
43 43 appeal Attorney Cover Letter Wed 04/24 12:44 PM
Attorney Cover Letter re:40 Notice of Appeal(lmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
42 42 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 04/24 12:43 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re40 Notice of Appeal (lmf)
Related: [-]
41 41 appeal Docketing Statement Wed 04/24 11:29 AM
Docketing Statement by Michelle Hagen re40 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
40 40 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/24 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to35 Judgment,34 Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Motions by Michelle Hagen. Filing Fee PAID $605, receipt number AWIEDC-4662180 (cc: all counsel) Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
39 39 misc Costs Taxed Wed 04/24 9:52 AM
COSTS TAXED in amount of $ 6673.31 against Michelle Hagen. NOTICE: Pursuant to Civil L. R. 54(c) - A party may move for review of the Clerk of Court's decision taxing costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) within 7 days from taxation. The motion, supporting papers, and scheduling must conform to Civil L. R. 7. (cc: all counsel) (edr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Wed 04/17 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re36 Bill of Costs filed by Fond du Lac School District ; To ensure proper processing of the Bill of Costs this document must be submitted using the form provided on our web site;please use the proper form and email it (do not re-file it) to wied_clerks_milw@wied.uscourts.gov; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (edr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
38 38 misc Letter Mon 04/15 9:20 AM
LETTER from Attorney William Rettko Re: Defendant's Bill of Costs . Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
37 37 misc Briefing Letter Transmitted Tue 04/02 3:19 PM
BRIEFING LETTER Electronically Transmitted to Parties re36 Bill of Costs. Objections due 4/16/2024, Response due 4/23/2024, and Reply due 4/30/2024. (cc: all counsel) (edr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
36 36 misc Bill of Costs Mon 04/01 9:28 AM
BILL OF COSTS Proposed by Fond du Lac School District (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
35 35 order Judgment Wed 03/27 3:39 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/27/2024. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
34 34 68 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/27 3:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/27/2024 GRANTING19 defendant's motion for summary judgment. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
33 33 misc Declaration Fri 09/10 10:09 AM
DECLARATION of Oyvind Wistrom (Supplemental)(Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SS - 2017 School Climate Survey,
Att: 2 Exhibit TT - 2018 School Climate Survey,
Att: 3 Exhibit UU - 2019 School Climate Survey,
Att: 4 Exhibit VV deposition exhibit 53 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is the 2018-19 Recommendation for Administrator Contract,
Att: 5 Exhibit WW - deposition exhibit 67 from the April 7, 2021 deposition of Matthew Steinbarth, which is the SAPES Guidebook (July 2017),
Att: 6 Exhibit XX copy of Garcia v. GFG Corp., 1999 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 19227 (E.D. Wis. 1999),
Att: 7 Exhibit YY copy of Cole v. Greater Clark Cty Schs., 2004 U.S. Dist. Lexis 2822 (S.D. Ind. 2004)
32 32 64 pgs respm Reply (Non-Motion) Fri 09/10 10:04 AM
REPLY filed by Fond du Lac School District re21 Proposed Findings of Fact,27 Objections in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment . (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response (Non-Motion) Fri 09/10 10:01 AM
RESPONSE filed by Fond du Lac School District re25 Proposed Findings of Fact in Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Declaration Fri 09/10 9:51 AM
DECLARATION of Stacey Buchholz(Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Supervisor Evaluation Timeline
29 29 misc Declaration Fri 09/10 9:49 AM
DECLARATION of James Sebert(Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- February 8, 2017 letter to James Sebert
28 28 respm Reply Brief in Support of Motion Fri 09/10 9:45 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Fond du Lac School District re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
27 27 misc Objections Fri 08/27 10:46 AM
RESPONSE to21 Proposed Findings of Fact OBJECTIONS by Michelle Hagen to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact . Related [+] Modified on 8/27/2021 (asc)
Related: [-] ttko, William
26 26 misc Affidavit Fri 08/27 10:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT of William R. Rettko . Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
Att: 1 1-Dep Tr of Michelle Hagen,
Att: 2 2-Dep. Tr of James Sebert,
Att: 3 3-Dep. Tr of Sharon Simon,
Att: 4 4-Dep. Tr of Matthew Steinbarth,
Att: 5 5-Dep. Tr of Danica Lewis,
Att: 6 6-Dep. Tr of Torrie Rochon-Luft,
Att: 7 7-Dep Ex 8-lunch group email exchange,
Att: 8 8-Dep Ex 10-Steinbarth 4/13/17 email,
Att: 9 9-Dep Ex 11-Hagen 2015-16 Eval,
Att: 10 10-Dep Ex 14-Sebert 5/23/17 email,
Att: 11 11-Dep Ex 25-Steinbarth 2017-18 Eval,
Att: 12 12-Dep Ex 31-2015 16 Admin Contract Recommendation,
Att: 13 13-Dep Ex 33-Hagen 2014-15 Eval,
Att: 14 14-Dep Ex 47-Hagen 2016-17 Eval,
Att: 15 15-Dep Ex 49-Hagen 5/30/17 Notes of Sebert phone call,
Att: 16 16-Dep Ex 52-Hagen 2018-19 Contract,
Att: 17 17-Dep Ex 53-2018 19 Administrator Contract Recommendation,
Att: 18 18-Dep Ex 54-Hagen/Simon email exchange Re: retirement,
Att: 19 19-Dep Ex 60-Plaintiff Answers to Def 1st Set of Interrogs,
Att: 20 20-Dep Ex 72-Rochon-Luft 2015-16 Eval,
Att: 21 21-Def Resp to Pl 1st Req for Admissions,
Att: 22 22-Hagen/Daniels email exchange Re: Climate Surveys,
Att: 23 23-Def EEOC Response,
Att: 24 24-Scottberg 2016-17 Eval
25 25 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Fri 08/27 10:06 AM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Michelle Hagen Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
24 24 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/27 10:03 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Michelle Hagen re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
Friday, July 30, 2021
23 23 misc Declaration Fri 07/30 11:24 AM
DECLARATION of Oyvind Wistrom(Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A Michelle Hagens EEOC charge, December 7, 2017,
Att: 2 Ex. B EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights letter, October 2, 2019,
Att: 3 Ex. C Complaint, filed on December 19, 2019,
Att: 4 Ex. D Bruce Niendorf, Ph.D. Expert Report dated August 27, 2020,
Att: 5 Ex. E Bruce Niendorf, Ph.D. Amended Expert Report dated August 28, 2020,
Att: 6 Ex. G Excerpts of the January 27, 2021 deposition transcript of Michelle Hagen,
Att: 7 Ex. H Excerpts of the December 16, 2020 deposition transcript of Danica Lewis,
Att: 8 Ex. I Excerpts of the December 10, 2020 deposition transcript of James Sebert,
Att: 9 Ex. J Excerpts of the December 16, 2020 deposition transcript of Sharon Simon,
Att: 10 Ex. K Excerpts of the April 7, 2021 deposition transcript of Matthew Steinbarth,
Att: 11 Ex. L Depo. Ex. 1 from the December 10, 2020 deposition of James Sebert, which is a Fond du Lac School District Application Process, HAGEN-0342,
Att: 12 Ex. M Depo. Ex. 26 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a WECAN application,
Att: 13 Ex. N Depo. Ex. 27 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Administrator Contract for the position of assistant principal at Fond du Lac High School, dated August 5, 2013,
Att: 14 Ex. O Depo. Ex. 28 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a list of Fond du Lac School District administrators,
Att: 15 Ex. P Depo. Ex. 29 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a posting for the principal position at Fond du Lac High School,
Att: 16 Ex. Q Depo. Ex. 30 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Administrator Contract for the position of principal at Fond du Lac High School, for the period July 1, 2014 June 30, 2016,
Att: 17 Ex. R Depo. Ex. 31 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is the 2015-2016 Administrator Contract Recommendation,
Att: 18 Ex. S Depo. Ex. 32 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is the Fond du Lac School District Management Plan for 2016-2017,
Att: 19 Ex. T Depo. Ex. 33 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens 2014-2015 Summative Report,
Att: 20 Ex. U Depo. Ex. 34 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a portion of the SAPES Guidebook.,
Att: 21 Ex. V Depo. Ex. 35 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Administrator Contract for the position of principal at Fond du Lac High School, for the period July 1, 2015 June 30, 2017,
Att: 22 Ex. W Depo. Ex. 36 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is the 2016-17 Recommendation Administrator Contracts,
Att: 23 Ex. X Depo. Ex. 38 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Summative Report from 2015 to 2016,
Att: 24 Ex. Y Depo. Ex. 39 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a Summary of the 2017 School Climate Survey,
Att: 25 Ex. Z Depo. Ex. 40 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Administrator Contract for the position of principal at Fond du Lac High School, for the period July 1, 2016 June 30, 2018,
Att: 26 Ex. AA Depo. Ex. 41 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is the Strategies for Growth 2016-17 document,
Att: 27 Ex. BB Depo. Ex. 42 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a spreadsheet prepared by Ms. Hagen, HAGEN-0386,
Att: 28 Ex. CC Depo. Ex. 43 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a spreadsheet prepared by Ms. Hagen,
Att: 29 Ex. DD Depo. Ex. 44 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a spreadsheet prepared by Ms. Hagen, HAGEN-0511,
Att: 30 Ex. EE Depo. Ex. 45 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a chart prepared by Ms. Hagen, HAGEN-02526,
Att: 31 Ex. FF Depo. Ex. 47 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Summative Report from 2016 to 2017,
Att: 32 Ex. GG Depo. Ex. 48 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which are Ms. Hagens notes of the May 24, 2017 meeting,
Att: 33 Ex. HH Depo. Ex. 50 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a memo Dr. Sebert wrote to Ms. Hagen regarding her reassignment to elementary principal position at Roberts School,
Att: 34 Ex. II Depo. Ex. 52 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens Administrator Contract for the position of principal at Roberts Elementary School, for the period August 14, 2018 June 19, 2020,
Att: 35 Ex. JJ Depo. Ex. 54 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which are emails between Ms. Hagen and Sharon Simon regarding Ms. Hagens retirement,
Att: 36 Ex. KK Depo. Ex. 55 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is a document announcing Ms. Hagens retirement to the Roberts School,
Att: 37 Ex. LL Depo. Ex. 58 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Ms. Hagens March 12, 2018 submission to the EEOC,
Att: 38 Ex. MM Depo. Ex. 60 from the January 27, 2021 deposition of Michelle Hagen, which is Plaintiffs Answers to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 39 Ex. NN Depo. Ex. 68 from the April 7, 2021 deposition of Matthew Steinbarth, which is the EP School Administrator Summative Report for Mr. Steinbarth for the 2014-2015 school year,
Att: 40 Ex. OO Depo. Ex. 69 from the April 7, 2021 deposition of Matthew Steinbarth, which is the EP School Administrator Summative Report for the 2015-2016 school year,
Att: 41 Ex. PP - Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Written Interrogatories (Amended) and Sixth Request for Production of Documents,
Att: 42 Ex. QQ copy of Cole v. Greater Clark County Schs., 2004 U.S. Dist. Lexis 2822 (S.D. Ind. 2004),
Att: 43 Ex. RR - copy of Henderson v. Shulkin, 2020 U.S. Dist. Lexis 38109 (N.D. Ill. 2020)
22 22 misc Declaration Fri 07/30 11:11 AM
DECLARATION of Sharon Simon(Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. F Michelle Hagens DPI license print-out
21 21 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Fri 07/30 11:10 AM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Fond du Lac School District (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 07/30 11:06 AM
BRIEF in Support filed by Fond du Lac School District re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Fri 07/30 11:05 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fond du Lac School District. (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
18 18 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/05 9:45 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/5/2021 re17 Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation to extend deadlines. The court ORDERS that the time for the parties to complete discovery is EXTENDED until the end of the day on June 30, 2021; the deadline for the parties to file dispositive motions is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 30, 2021, responses are due by the end of the day on August 27, 2021, replies are due by the end of the day on September 10, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 02/03 3:45 PM
STIPULATION [Joint] to Amend Scheduling Order by Fond du Lac School District. (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
16 16 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 10/30 1:44 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/30/2020 re13 Motion to Enter Order Extending Discovery and Modifying Dispositive Motion Deadlines and14 Stipulation to Extend Discovery and Modify Dispositive Motion Deadlines. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation to modify deadlines and GRANTS the motion to enter an order. The court ORDERS that the time for the parties to complete discovery is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 2, 2021; the time for the parties to file dispositive motions is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 30, 2021, responses shall be filed by the end of the day on June 1, 2021; replies shall be filed by the end of the day on June 16, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
15 15 misc Proposed Document Thu 10/29 3:32 PM
PROPOSED Order to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Michelle Hagen. Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 10/29 3:27 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Michelle Hagen. Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/29 3:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Michelle Hagen. Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 1:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/21/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 8/31/2020; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 10/31/2020; Discovery due by 2/1/2021; Dispositive Motions or Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2021, for dispositive motions, responses due by 4/5/2021, replies due by 4/20/2021. Any party filing proposed findings of fact shall email Word version of proposed findings to PepperPO@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Fri 01/17 10:22 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/14 11:42 AM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/14/2020. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 2/4/2020. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/13 1:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Fond du Lac School District.(Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 01/13 1:05 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fond du Lac School District. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 01/13 1:03 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Fond du Lac School District. (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Fri 01/03 8:21 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/02 11:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Hagen. Fond du Lac School District served on 12/27/2019. Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/02 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofor L Hanson on behalf of Fond du Lac School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Kristofor L. Hanson (Hanson, Kristofor)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/02 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oyvind Wistrom on behalf of Fond du Lac School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Oyvind Wistrom (Wistrom, Oyvind)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 8:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Fond du Lac School District. (amb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 12/19 12:05 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Michelle Hagen. Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
2 2 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 12/19 12:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michelle Hagen. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Fond du Lac School District by Michelle Hagen. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3311097) Related [+]
Related: [-] ttko, William
Att: 1 Exhibit A-EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 12/19 11:44 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
Related: [-]