Original Case: 2:19-cv-01863

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01688
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 4:10 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
FOND DU LAC SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
Oyvind Wistrom
LINDNER & MARSACK, S.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHELLE HAGEN
Represented By
William Rettko
RETTKO LAW OFFICES
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 4:09 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/08/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for Michelle Hagen. [1] [7378435] 24-1688 (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2024 02:50 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 78 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court