Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00183
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2019
Terminated:Aug 04, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hagan Electronics, Inc.
972 United Circle
Sparks, NV 89431
Represented By
Hagan Electronics, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/04 10:48 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-183 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/03 7:59 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Hagan Electronics, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
22 22 order Compromise Wed 05/13 3:27 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, April 17, 2020
21 21 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Fri 04/17 10:19 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Approve Compromise With Hagan Electronics, Inc.
20 20 motion Compromise Fri 04/17 8:38 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Hagan Electronics, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
19 19 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Wed 04/01 8:32 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar - Remove Wed 04/01 8:21 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - AP Settled Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 5/29/2020. Discovery due: 7/30/2020. Amendment(s) due by 5/29/2020. Motions due by 9/2/2020. Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2020. Trial date set for 11/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. .
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
utility Note - Deficiency Notice Sent in Error (Public) Tue 03/10 2:41 PM
NOTE: Deficiency Notice was sent in error. (Service Proper). Please disregard. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 12 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 03/05 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/04/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
17 17 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 03/05 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/04/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, March 02, 2020
16 16 ordap Referring Case to Mediated Settlement Conference Mon 03/02 2:36 PM
Order Referring Case to Mediated Settlement Conference To Be Concluded On Or Before 9/1/2020.Selection Of Mediator due by 3/16/2020. Mediator Report due by 9/15/2020. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
15 15 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Mon 03/02 1:25 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Scheduling Order- Trial set 11/10/2020
14 14 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/02 1:23 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 5/29/2020. Discovery due: 7/30/2020. Amendment(s) due by 5/29/2020. Motions due by 9/2/2020. Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2020. Trial date set for 11/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
13 13 admis Pre-Conference Report Mon 02/24 1:38 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Friday, February 21, 2020
12 12 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Fri 02/21 3:11 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Adam Gottsegen. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The notice of appearance was not served on the debtor(s), debtor(s) attorney or both as required by Rules 7004(b)(9) and 7004(g) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Upon completion of proper service, a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 3/6/2020. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.11 Notice of Appearance filed by Adam M. Gottsegen on behalf of Hagan Electronics, Inc.. filed by Hagan Electronics, Inc.
Thursday, February 20, 2020
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 3:29 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Adam M. Gottsegen on behalf of Hagan Electronics, Inc.. (Gottsegen, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Thu 02/13 11:53 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - No appearance of counsel filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.6 Order Regarding Filing by Pro Se Corporation
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 01/30 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 01/29/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 01/30 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 01/29/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, January 27, 2020
8 8 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Mon 01/27 2:37 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 2/26/2020. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Calendar - Schedule Mon 01/27 2:24 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Pro Se Corporation Mon 01/27 2:23 PM
Order Regarding Filing by Pro Se Corporation . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/27 2:23 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Hagan Electronics, Inc.. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
4 4 misc Affidavit Mon 01/06 10:15 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Reissued
Friday, December 27, 2019
3 3 court Summons Reissued Fri 12/27 11:09 AM
Summons Reissued on Hagan Electronics, Inc. Date Issued 12/27/2019, Answer Due 1/27/2020 (Baker, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 12/20 1:03 PM
Summons Issued on Hagan Electronics, Inc. Answer Due 01/21/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 1:03 PM
Adversary case 19-00183 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Hagan Electronics, Inc. (Fee Paid) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
crditcrd none (ADI) Fri 12/20 1:27 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint([LINK 19-00183 5-SWH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A15254884, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Note - CA Assignment (Public) Fri 12/20 1:19 PM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Christy Gurgone (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadline (Private) Fri 12/20 1:20 PM
Answer due by 01/21/2020 (adi)
Related: [-]