David Clifford v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-10736 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2019 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:19-cv-08008 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 16, 2020 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Clifford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/01 12:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Mon 12/23 3:42 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Mon 12/23 2:44 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to the Central District of California via ECF. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | ||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 12/23 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) |
|
13 | 13
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Mon 12/23 3:37 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-35 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 12/19/19 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:19-cv-08008-CRB from U.S. District Court California Northern District (San Francisco). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (car) |
|
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-35) by MDL Panel transferring case to the Central District of California. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
8 | 8 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225] . (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
7 | 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/23/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Ford Motor Company(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV357686. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13956169). Filed byFord Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Of Spencer P. Hugret In Support Of Ford Motor Companys Notice Of Removal Of Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, 1446, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Of Molly J. Mrowka In Support Of Ford Motor Companys Notice Of Removal Of Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, 1446, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Defendant Ford Motor Companys Certification Of Interested Entities Or Persons, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFord Motor Company. (cv, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/23/2019.] |