State of New York v. United States Department of He
Original Case: 1:19-cv-04676
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-04254 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 09, 2022 4:03 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae
State of Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Alaska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Arkansas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Montana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Nebraska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of South Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of South Dakota
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Senator Daniel Coats
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Representative David Weldon
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Coalition for Jewish Values
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Public Advocate of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Pro-Life Legal Defense Fund
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
United States Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
California Constitutional Rights Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Eagle Forum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Eagle Forum Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
One Nation Under God Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
78 Current Members of Congress
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American College of Pediatricians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Catholic Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Catholic Bioethics Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association of Catholic Nurses, USA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Center for Law & Justice
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American College of Osteopathic Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association of Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American College of Emergency Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Society for Reproductive Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American College of Nurse-Midwives
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Muslim Health Professionals
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
World Professional Association for Transgender Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Medical Society of the State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Mindy Swank
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Meghan Eagen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Rachael Lorenzo
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
158 Current Members of Congress
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Center for Lesbian Rights
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Callen-Lorde Community Health Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Center for Constitutional Rights
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Empire Justice Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Equality California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Equality Federation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Family Equality
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FORGE, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FreeState Justice, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Howard Brown Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Human Rights Campaign
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Legacy Community Health Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Legal Voice
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
LGBT Bar Association of New York
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Movement Advancement Project
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Center for Transgender Equality
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National LGBT Cancer Network
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National LGBTQ Task Force
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Trans Bar Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
One Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
OutFront Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
QLaw
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Sage
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
San Francisco LGBT Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Transgender Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Transgender Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Maine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of North Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The State of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The American Public Health Organization and Experts in Public Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Scholars of the LGBT Population
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated-Defendant
Roger T. Severino, in his official capacity as Director, Office of Civil Rights, United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
|
Consolidated-Defendant
Office for Civil Rights, United StatesDepartment of Health and Human Services
|
|
Consolidated-Defendant
Roger T. Severino, in his official capacity as Director, Office for Civil Rights, United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
|
Consolidated-Defendant
Office for Civil Rights, United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
|
Defendant
Alex M. Azar, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Dr. Regina Frost
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Christian Medical and Dental Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Alex M. Azar, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood of Northern New England, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association
|
|
Plaintiff
Public Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Hawaii
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Michigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
City of Chicago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Cook County, Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Planned Parenthood of Northern New England, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Public Health Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/09/2022 3:43 AM EST |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Christian Medical and Dental Association and Regina Frost, FILED. [2736761] 19-4254 [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:27 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 59 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 147 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2736776] 19-4254 [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:30 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2736780] 19-4254 [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:30 AM] | |
4 | 4 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2736783] 19-4254 [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:31 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2736788] 19-4254 [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:32 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 61 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |