Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11365

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:19-ap-01090
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Terminated:Mar 24, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Catarino F Felan, III
1708A Dexter Street
Austin, TX 78704
Represented By
Orlando Antelo, Jr.
Antelo Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Orlando Antelo, Jr
Antelo Law PA 2103 Coral Way #805
Miami, FL 33145
Represented By
Orlando Antelo, Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
John Patrick Lowe
J. Patrick Lowe P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, March 26, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/26 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Default Judgment Revoking 727 Discharge. (Order entered on 3/24/2020)
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
12 12 order AP-Judgment Denying or Revoking 727 Discharge (Adversary) (PDF) Tue 03/24 9:30 AM
Default Judgment Revoking 727 Discharge. (Order entered on 3/24/2020) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/24 9:31 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 29, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/29 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default against Catarino F Felan III (related document(s):1 Adversary case 19-01090 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Catarino F Felan III (attorney Orlando Antelo Jr.) (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)))). (Attachments: #1 Adversary Coversheet))
Thursday, February 27, 2020
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default (F) Thu 02/27 8:37 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Catarino F Felan III Related [+] (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-01090 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Catarino F Felan III (attorney Orlando Antelo Jr.) (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)))). (Attachments: #1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
9 9 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/26 11:36 AM
Motion For Default Judgment against Catarino F. Felan, III Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT "A" - Amended Complaint to Revoke the Discharge of Catarino F. Felan, III
Att: 2 Copies of Signed CMRRRs and USPS Tracking
Att: 3 Plaintiff's Service Members Civil Relief Act Affidavit
Att: 4 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 02/26 10:11 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to Catarino F. Felan, III filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, February 07, 2020
7 7 misc Amended Complaint Fri 02/07 11:52 AM
Amended Complaint () filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-01090 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Catarino F Felan III (attorney Orlando Antelo Jr.) (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, January 23, 2020
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Thu 01/23 7:16 AM
Catarino F Felan III answer deadline updated to 2/14/2020 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
6 6 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 01/22 10:29 AM
Stipulation for an Extension of Time in Which to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
court Filing fee Paid in Full Thu 12/26 6:10 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by BT. Receipt Number 102411. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
5 5 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 12/24 8:47 AM
Summons Served on Orlando Antelo Jr - served on 12/24/2019 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 12/24 8:39 AM
Summons Served on Catarino F Felan III - served on 12/24/2019 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 12/24 8:34 AM
Summons Served on Catarino F Felan III - served on 12/24/2019 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 12/23 4:20 PM
Summons Issued on Catarino F Felan III Answer Due 01/22/2020 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 4:20 PM
Adversary case 19-01090 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Catarino F Felan III (attorney Orlando Antelo Jr.) (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)))). (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet