Marshall et al v. National Bank of Middlebury
Vermont District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey W Crawford |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-00246 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 27, 2020 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
National Bank of Middlebury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce R. Marshall
P.O. Box 45
Rochester, VT 05767 |
|
Plaintiff
Jeanine Weir
P.O. Box 45
Rochester, VT 05767 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
69 | 69
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 02/13 3:43 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to Jeanine Weir Case No 22-1323 as to64 Notice of Appeal. Appeal dismissed effective 01/09/2023. Form D-P not filed, case is deemed in default. (gmg) |
|
68 | 68
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 02/13 3:20 PM
MANDATE of USCA Case No 22-1323 as to Bruce R. Marshal re:64 Notice of Appeal. Appeal dismissed effective 01/09/2023. Form D-P not filed, case is deemed in default. (gmg) Text clarified on 2/13/2023 (jlh) |