Taurisano et al v. Tabb et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Gary L Sharpe |
Referred: | Therese Wiley Dancks |
Case #: | 6:19-cv-01637 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 28, 2020 6:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Coldwell Banker Paradise
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ed Schlitt Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hoyt Murphy Realtors
|
|
Defendant
Ocean Village Rentals
|
|
Defendant
David Randy Tabb
|
|
Defendant
Deborah Tabb
|
|
Plaintiff
Gayle Taurisano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael P. Taurisano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
55 | 55
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 06/04 4:46 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to51 Notice of Appeal. [Mandate issued 6/3/2021](dpk) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 06/08 11:19 AM
USCA Case Number 21-1080 for51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Taurisano, Gayle Taurisano. (jel, ) |