BDC Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-10010 |
Case Filed: | Jan 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 15, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Borden Dairy Company
8750 N Central Expy Ste 400
Dallas, TX 75231-6417 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | One of America's oldest and largest milk producers files for bankruptcy (cnn.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/06/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
1786 | 1786
crditcrd
none
Fri 10/28 2:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Request for Certification of Document (fee)([LINK 20-10010 CSS] ) [misc,reqcert] ( 11.00). Receipt Number A10895646, amount $ 11.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1785 | 1785
misc
Request for Certification of Document (fee)
Fri 10/28 2:47 PM
Certification Request for . Certification is to be emailed to the following email address: kim.morzak@haynesboone.com Fee Amount $11 Filed by New Dairy OpCo, LLC. (Murphy, James) |