Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00008
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:Feb 21, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Doris B. Jenkins
1935 June Baldwin Road
Cerro Gordo, NC 28430
Represented By
Doris B. Jenkins
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/21 12:50 PM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-8 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/20 1:30 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Doris B. Jenkins filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
4 4 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Mon 02/03 2:18 PM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit Wed 01/15 10:30 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Monday, January 06, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/06 1:25 PM
Summons Issued on Doris B. Jenkins Answer Due 02/5/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 1:25 PM
Adversary case 20-00008 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Doris B. Jenkins (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A