Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-22881

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:20-ap-00008
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:Feb 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC
Represented By
Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna Marie Falcone
Represented By
Daniel J Schneider
Edelson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Monday, February 22, 2021
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/22 2:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-8 Closed . (Livermore, Corrina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
21 21 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/10 2:40 PM
(E)Order Mooting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Related [+]. Signed on 12/10/2020. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/02 2:54 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel J Schneider on behalf of Anna Marie Falcone. (Schneider, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
19 19 13 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 11/13 3:03 PM
Memorandum in Response to, and Partial Joinder of, the Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Rosanne Ciambrone on behalf of Pipeline Health Systems LLC, Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC. (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, October 30, 2020
18 18 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 10/30 2:58 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Creating relationship to document #16, Removing relationship to document #14 Related [+]. (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-] 17 Order Scheduling
17 17 order Scheduling Fri 10/30 2:12 PM
Amended Agreed Order Scheduling . Response due by 12/11/2020 and Pipeline's joinder or response due by 11/13/2020. Reply due by: 12/28/2020. The December 10, 2020 status date is stricken. Status hearing to be held on 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM at Appear using Zoom for Government. Signed on 10/30/2020 (Pruitt, Debra). Related document(s)16 Notice of Motion and Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment/Order Related [+] filed by Intervenor Pipeline Health Systems LLC. Modified on 10/30/2020 Creating relationship to document #16, Removing relationship to document #14 (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-] 10 Order Scheduling
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
16 16 motion Alter or Amend Judgment or Order/New Trial( Rule 9023) Tue 10/20 12:04 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment/Order Related [+] Filed by Rosanne Ciambrone on behalf of Pipeline Health Systems LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 09:30 AM at Appear by Telephone. (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
Related: [-] 10 Order Scheduling
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 08, 2020
15 15 17 pgs misc Memorandum Thu 10/08 3:49 PM
Memorandum Filed by Allen J Guon on behalf of Ira Bodenstein, not personally, but as chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC Related [+]. (Guon, Allen)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
14 14 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/08 3:47 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Allen J Guon on behalf of Ira Bodenstein, not personally, but as chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 09:30 AM at Appear by Videoconference. (Guon, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 01, 2020
13 13 order Intervene Thu 10/01 2:49 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion To Intervene Related [+]. Signed on 10/01/2020. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, September 21, 2020
12 12 misc Exhibit Mon 09/21 1:24 PM
Exhibit(s) A Filed by Rosanne Ciambrone on behalf of Pipeline Health Systems LLC Related [+]. (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Intervene
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 18, 2020
11 11 motion Intervene Fri 09/18 3:08 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene in Adversary Proceeding Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7024 Filed by Rosanne Ciambrone on behalf of Pipeline Health Systems LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/1/2020 at 09:00 AM at Appear by Telephone. (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Thu 09/17 11:57 AM
Agreed Order Scheduling Related [+]. Trustee Motion to Dismiss due by 10/09/2020. Plaintiff Response due by 11/6/2020. Trustee Reply due by: 11/20/2020. Signed on 9/17/2020 (Corona, Christina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 11, 2020
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 09/11 2:04 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 12/10/2020 at 09:30 AM at Appear by Telephone. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Fri 09/11 2:02 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 11/12/2020 Stricken Related [+]. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, July 16, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 07/16 4:34 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 613 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/16/2020. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 02/27 4:07 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 613 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/27/2020. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 order Stay Thu 02/27 4:07 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion To Stay Related [+]. Signed on 02/27/2020. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, February 14, 2020
4 4 motion Stay Fri 02/14 2:56 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion To Stay Adversary Proceeding Filed by Allen J Guon on behalf of Ira Bodenstein, not personally, but as chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Guon, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 01/07 11:02 AM
Receipt of Complaint 20-00008 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 41323172. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, January 06, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/06 6:33 PM
Summons Issued on Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC Answer Due 02/5/2020 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 6:33 PM
Adversary case 20-00008 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Anna Marie Falcone against Pipeline-Westlake Hospital, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Schneider, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet