Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-22878

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:19-bk-22881
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Oct 02, 2019
Claims Deadline:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025

Debtor
Pipeline - Westlake Hospital, LLC
1225 W. Lake Street
Melrose Park, IL 60160
Represented By
Eric J Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jeffrey C Dan
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Jeffrey R Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Scott R Clar
Crane, Simon, Clar & Goodman
contact info
Last checked: never
Intervenor
Pipeline Health Systems
Represented By
Rosanne Ciambrone
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Special Party
SRC Hospital Investments II, LLC
Represented By
John R Weiss
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Rosanne Ciambrone
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Trustee
Ira Bodenstein
Fox Rothschild LLP 321 N Clark Street Suite 1600
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Ira Bodenstein
contact info
Allen J Guon
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
David R Doyle
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Robert M Fishman
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Terence G Banich
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 3:11 PM CDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.