Marvin P. Staton et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00139 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 1:19-cv-01770 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 04, 2020 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Decker Ford Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin P. Staton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Staton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
transfer
Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
Wed 03/13 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:20-cv-00139-AB-PDx. (cbr) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Wed 01/08 10:04 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Tue 01/07 4:45 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
9 | 9
order
For Order MDL - Order
Tue 01/07 11:14 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-37). CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. Electronic Records sent. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 01/08 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) |
|
11 | 11
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Wed 01/08 9:54 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 37 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 1/6/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:19-cv-01770-AWI-EPG from USDC Eastern District of California (Fresno). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB (FFMx). (et) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re6 Civil New Case Documents for AWI. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
6 | 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) MDL No. 2814 by Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A in Support of Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B in Support of Notice of Related Cases | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Molly Jeannette Mrowka on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Mrowka, Molly Jeannette added.(Mrowka, Molly) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ford Motor Company(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno, case number 19CECG04203 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8628313)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I in support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in Support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 11 Declaration of Molly J. Mrowka in Support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit A in Support of Molly J. Mrowka Declaration, | ||
Att: 13 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, | ||
Att: 14 Proof of Service |