Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00012
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2020
Terminated:Oct 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wilmer Barrio Ramos
204 Alex Lane
Walstonburg, NC 27888
Represented By
Wilmer Barrio Ramos
contact info
Defendant
Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc.
122 Tracey Lane
Walstonburg, NC 27888
Represented By
Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
17 17 court Writ Issued Tue 08/31 4:15 PM
Issued Writ of Execution. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
court Returned Mail (Text) Thu 10/08 9:41 AM
Notification of Returned Mail addressed to Defendant Wilmer Barrio Ramos, Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc.. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, October 02, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/02 1:36 PM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-12 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
16 16 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 09/19 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/18/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
15 15 order Default Judgment Wed 09/16 2:20 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Wilmer Barrio Ramos , Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, September 14, 2020
14 14 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/14 4:48 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Wilmer Barrio Ramos, Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Entry of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John C. Bircher, III
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
court Returned Mail (Text) Tue 08/11 9:45 AM
Notification of Returned Mail addressed to Defendant Wilmer Barrio Ramos and Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc.. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.12 Entry of Default
Monday, August 03, 2020
court Returned Mail (Text) Mon 08/03 4:37 PM
Notification of Returned Mail addressed to Defendant Wilmer Barrio Ramos. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer
Thursday, July 30, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 07/31 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 07/30/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
12 12 court Entry of Default Tue 07/28 11:26 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Sunday, July 26, 2020
11 11 motion Entry of Default Sun 07/26 9:09 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Wilmer Barrio Ramos, Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 07/13 9:03 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 12, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 07/13 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 07/12/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, July 10, 2020
8 8 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Fri 07/10 8:28 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 8/3/2020. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit Mon 07/06 11:38 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Summons Reissued
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
6 6 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 06/02 4:28 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 6/12/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
5 5 court Summons Reissued Thu 04/30 2:29 PM
Summons Reissued on Wilmer Barrio Ramos Date Issued 4/30/2020, Answer Due 6/1/2020; Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. Date Issued 4/30/2020, Answer Due 6/1/2020 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
4 4 court Summons Reissued Fri 03/20 1:07 PM
Summons Reissued on Wilmer Barrio Ramos Date Issued 3/20/2020, Answer Due 4/20/2020; Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. Date Issued 3/20/2020, Answer Due 4/20/2020 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Mon 02/10 3:56 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 2/20/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 01/08 9:40 AM
Summons Issued on Wilmer Barrio Ramos Answer Due 02/7/2020; Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. Answer Due 02/7/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/08 9:40 AM
Adversary case 20-00012 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Wilmer Barrio Ramos, Wilmer Barrios Labor Contractor, Inc. (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 01/08 1:20 PM
Answer due by 02/07/2020 (adi)
Related: [-]