Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00017
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2020
Terminated:Jun 12, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Catalina Galaviz
552 Clempson Green Drive
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Catalina Galaviz
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
16 16 court Writ Issued Tue 08/31 4:14 PM
Issued Writ of Execution. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/12 10:51 AM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-17 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 30, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 05/31 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/30/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, May 28, 2020
14 14 order Default Judgment Thu 05/28 1:13 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Catalina Galaviz Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
13 13 16 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Tue 05/26 11:27 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/26 11:25 AM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Catalina Galaviz filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Entry of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John C. Bircher, III
Thursday, March 26, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 03/27 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/26/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
10 10 court Entry of Default Tue 03/24 11:11 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 9 Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, March 20, 2020
9 9 motion Entry of Default Fri 03/20 11:12 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Catalina Galaviz filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
8 8 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Thu 03/12 7:52 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The Motion for Entry of Default/Affidavit for Entry of Default does not contain a statement that the Defendant is not in the military service, an infant or an incompetent. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 3/23/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.7 Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
7 7 motion Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application Tue 03/03 4:18 PM
Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] ument no.5 Motion for Entry of Default
Friday, February 21, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 02/22 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/21/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, February 20, 2020
5 5 motion Entry of Default Thu 02/20 12:22 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Catalina Galaviz filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Wed 02/19 2:22 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 3/12/2020. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit Wed 01/15 10:21 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Friday, January 10, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 01/10 4:15 PM
Summons Issued on Catalina Galaviz Answer Due 02/10/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/10 4:15 PM
Adversary case 20-00017 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Catalina Galaviz (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B