First River Energy, LLC v. QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP,
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-50085
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-50085
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:20-ap-05002 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP,, Defendant
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor,
New York,, NY 10010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
First River Energy, LLC, Plaintiff
1862 W. Bitters Road, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78248 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/16 6:31 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Saturday, August 15, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/15 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/15/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
AP-Dismiss Case (PDF)
Thu 08/13 2:10 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice (Order entered on 8/13/2020) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
court
Docket Call Held (Adversary)
Tue 07/07 6:29 PM
Docket Call Held: SETTLED, 9019 FILED 7/6/2020, ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY CASE TO COME AFTER ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING 9019 MOTION - Order due from Raymond Battaglia by 7/20/2020 (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 06/03 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
AP-Approving Motion to Withdraw or Strike Document (pdf)
Mon 06/01 7:50 AM
Order Striking (Order entered on 6/1/2020) (Paez, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
court
Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary)
Wed 05/27 1:20 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: , Dispositive Motions Due By 6/15/2020. (Gomez, Becky) |
||
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Tue 05/26 11:01 AM
Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Dispositive Motions filed by Patricia Baron Tomasco for Defendant Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/06 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Thu 03/05 9:47 AM
Amended Statement Regarding Consent filed by Patricia Baron Tomasco for Defendant Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Pleading for Lack of Compliance (pdf)
Wed 03/04 4:14 PM
Order Dismissing Document for Lack of Compliance (Order entered on 3/4/2020) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Tue 03/03 9:46 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Patricia Baron Tomasco for Defendant Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Tue 03/03 9:09 PM
Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Consent filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Plaintiff First River Energy, LLC (Battaglia, Raymond) Modified on 3/4/2020 (Gonzalez, Rosa) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 02/13 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
AP-Scheduling Order (F)
Wed 02/12 2:02 PM
Scheduling Order Docket Call Set For 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 Discovery due 5/12/2020, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/29/2020, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/22/2020. (Order entered on 2/12/2020) (Elizondo, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf)
Tue 02/11 2:12 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/11/2020) (Sosa, Alma) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/10 7:13 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service (Adversary)
Thu 01/30 10:58 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Plaintiff First River Energy, LLC (Battaglia, Raymond) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
AP-Obtain Summons Service (F)
Wed 01/29 4:13 PM
Order to Obtain Summons Service on Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (Order entered on 1/29/2020) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (Auto)
Fri 01/10 4:16 PM
Summons Issued on QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP, Answer Due 02/10/2020 (Battaglia, Raymond) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/10 4:16 PM
Adversary case 20-05002 Complaint filed by First River Energy, LLC (attorney Raymond W. Battaglia) against QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP, (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Battaglia, Raymond) |