Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC et al v. ACSI Holdings, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:12-bk-31267
Lead BK case is: 4:12-bk-31267
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:20-ap-03014 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ACSI Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas R Bray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fuqua Family Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jamison & Associates, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul G Hendershott
2802 Ferndale
Houston, TX 77098 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 18 2021
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 11/18/2021 (Related document(s):110 Generic Motion, 119 Courtroom Minutes, 122 Courtroom Minutes) (TylerLaws) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Saturday, November 20, 2021 | ||
136 | 136
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 11/20 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/20/2021. (Admin.) |
|
135 | 135
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 11/20 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/20/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
134 | 134
order
Judgment
Thu 11/18 11:38 AM
Judgment in 4:20-ap-3014, Signed on 11/18/2021 (TylerLaws) |
|
133 | 133
26
pgs
order
Opinion
Thu 11/18 11:35 AM
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 11/18/2021 (TylerLaws) |