Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Jul 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
505 Fifth Avenue, Ste 729
Des Moines, IA 50309
Represented By
Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, July 26, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/26 9:47 AM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-26 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
41 41 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/23 4:14 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph) **Corrective Entry: Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Joseph Zachary Frost, Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Wayne Bailey, Inc.** Modified on 7/26/2021 (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
40 40 order Compromise Thu 06/24 4:03 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 36
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
39 39 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 06/22 1:14 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 7/2/2021. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.36 Motion to Approve Compromise With Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, June 04, 2021
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Fri 06/04 9:20 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - Certificate of Service Filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no. 37 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Thursday, June 03, 2021
38 38 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 06/03 9:17 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 36 Motion to Approve Compromise With Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
37 37 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Wed 06/02 7:39 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The certificate of service was omitted. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 6/14/2021. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.36 Motion to Approve Compromise With Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, May 28, 2021
36 36 motion Compromise Fri 05/28 9:34 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement and Release with Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Friday, April 16, 2021
utility Calendar - Remove Fri 04/16 8:31 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - AP Settled Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.30 Order Setting Final Pre-Trial Conference Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Humrickhouse. .
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
35 35 admis Report of Mediator/Examiner Wed 04/14 10:52 AM
Report of Mediator filed by Richard M. Hutson II on behalf of Richard M. Hutson II. (Hutson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
34 34 order Extend Time Wed 04/07 2:08 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Dispositive Motions: Due by 4/23/2021. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 33
Monday, April 05, 2021
33 33 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Mon 04/05 11:24 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Filing Dispositive Motions filed by Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
32 32 admis Report of Mediator/Examiner Wed 01/20 4:13 PM
Report of Mediator filed by Richard M. Hutson II on behalf of Richard M. Hutson II. (Hutson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
31 31 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 11/07 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 11/06/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
30 30 order Final Pre-Trial Conference Wed 11/04 9:53 AM
Order Setting Final Pre-Trial Conference Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Humrickhouse. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
29 29 order Amend Scheduling Order Tue 11/03 11:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Related [+] Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26 (a)(2) Disclosures due: 1/18/21. Discovery due: 3/1/21. Motions due by 4/7/2021. Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2021. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
28 28 audio Tue 11/03 11:20 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/3/2020 10:02:45 AM ]. File Size [ 4172 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:35 ]. (MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER). (admin)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar - Reschedule Tue 11/03 11:24 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Reschedule Hearing Date - Other- Preliminary Pretrial Conference continue to a date after May 26, 2021 Related [+] (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] ument no.29 Order Granting Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (related document(s):24 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.) Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26 (a)(2) Disclosures due: 1/18/21. Discovery due: 3/1/21. Motions due by 4/7/2021. Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2021.
Saturday, October 24, 2020
27 27 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Sun 10/25 1:46 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 10/24/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26
Thursday, October 22, 2020
26 26 court Hearing Set (Motion) Thu 10/22 11:31 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Humrickhouse (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
25 25 utility Calendar - Schedule Wed 10/21 3:17 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Telephone Conference Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.24 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Monday, October 19, 2020
24 24 motion Amend Scheduling Order Mon 10/19 12:14 PM
Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] ument no.18 Scheduling Order
Thursday, October 01, 2020
23 23 admis Designation of Mediator Thu 10/01 8:22 PM
Designation of Richard M. Hutson II as Mediator filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
22 22 misc Subpoena to Produce Documents Mon 08/24 2:35 PM
Subpoena to Produce Documents filed by Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Fri 07/31 8:26 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.21 Notice of Mediation
Thursday, July 30, 2020
21 21 notice Notice of Mediation Thu 07/30 6:40 PM
Notice of Mediation filed by Daniel Magee Anderson, Joseph Zachary Frost, Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 07/13 9:14 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
19 19 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 06/05 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/04/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/02 3:15 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 10/19/2020. Discovery due: 11/30/2020. Mediation Notification due 7/31/2020. Amendment(s) due by 7/31/2020. Motions due by 1/7/2021. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2020. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
17 17 admis Pre-Conference Report Fri 05/29 2:42 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
16 16 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Tue 05/05 2:31 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Pamela McAfee. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The attached document is incorrect or illegible. File the correct document as a Corrected PDF Attachment under the Miscellaneous category. Upon filing of the correct document, a corrective entry will be made. **Document does not include the Client Disclosure Statement** Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 5/19/2020. (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] ument no.15 Notice of Special Appearance filed by Daniel Magee Anderson, Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
utility Note - Deficiency Notice Sent in Error (Public) Tue 05/05 3:42 PM
NOTE: Deficiency Notice was sent in error. (Corporate ownership statement filed on 4/29/2020). Please disregard. Related [+] (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] 16 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Monday, May 04, 2020
15 15 misc Notice of Special Appearance Mon 05/04 11:48 AM
Notice of Special Appearance filed by Daniel Magee Anderson, Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 03, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 05/04 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/03/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, May 01, 2020
13 13 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Fri 05/01 8:51 AM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 6/1/2020. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
12 12 utility Calendar - Schedule Thu 04/30 7:27 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/29 5:08 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Daniel Anderson, Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/29 4:56 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Daniel Anderson, Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 04/29 4:02 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Pamela W. McAfee on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (McAfee, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 28, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 03/29 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/28/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, March 26, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 03/26 10:38 AM
Second Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer. Due by 4/29/2020 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
6 6 court Certificate of Mailing (Created by Court User) Mon 02/24 2:43 PM
Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Generic)
Sunday, February 23, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 02/24 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/23/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, February 21, 2020
4 4 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 02/21 2:54 PM
Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer. Due by 3/30/2020 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit Fri 01/24 10:09 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/21 3:42 PM
Summons Issued on Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company Answer Due 02/20/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 3:42 PM
Adversary case 20-00026 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K