Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00028
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Nov 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Frank Donio, Inc.
692 Egg Harbor Road
Hammonton, NJ 08037
Represented By
Frank Donio, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/18 1:49 PM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-28 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/17 8:24 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Frank Donio, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
22 22 order Compromise Mon 11/16 4:26 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
21 21 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Tue 10/20 3:32 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Approve Compromise With Frank Donio, Inc.
20 20 motion Compromise Tue 10/20 3:20 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Frank Donio, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims
Saturday, September 05, 2020
19 19 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 09/06 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/05/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, September 03, 2020
18 18 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Thu 09/03 11:13 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Default Judgment Thu 09/03 11:08 AM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Frank Donio, Inc. Related [+] (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, August 31, 2020
16 16 17 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 08/31 3:11 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment as to Frank Donio, Inc.
15 15 motion Default Judgment Mon 08/31 3:09 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Frank Donio, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Entry of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John C. Bircher, III
Friday, August 28, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 08/29 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/28/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
13 13 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 08/26 2:20 PM
Order Regarding Show Cause Order Related [+]. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 10 Order to Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
12 12 audio Wed 08/19 11:40 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/19/2020 10:33:54 AM ]. File Size [ 1928 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:21 ]. (SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE). (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 08/09 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/08/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, August 06, 2020
10 10 order Show Cause (Failure to Prosecute) Thu 08/06 1:12 PM
Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility Calendar - Schedule Thu 08/06 10:30 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 03/13 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/12/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
7 7 court Entry of Default Tue 03/10 11:51 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, March 06, 2020
6 6 motion Entry of Default Fri 03/06 7:44 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Frank Donio, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 03/06 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/05/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Tue 03/03 10:32 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 3/25/2020. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit Fri 01/24 10:08 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/21 4:27 PM
Summons Issued on Frank Donio, Inc. Answer Due 02/20/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 4:26 PM
Adversary case 20-00028 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Frank Donio, Inc. (Fee Paid) (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]