Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00029
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Karl Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Karl Logistics, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, September 12, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 09/13 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/12/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, September 10, 2020
10 10 order Dismiss Show Cause Order Thu 09/10 10:57 AM
Order Dismissing Show Cause Order Related [+]. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute
utility Calendar - Remove Thu 09/10 10:56 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - Other- Voluntary Dismissal Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause hearing to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Humrickhouse. .
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/10 10:59 AM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-29 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/08 12:40 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Karl Logistics, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
8 8 order Show Cause (Failure to Prosecute) Tue 09/01 3:06 PM
Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause hearing to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Humrickhouse. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
7 7 order Show Cause (Failure to Prosecute) Fri 08/28 8:09 AM
Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause hearing to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Humrickhouse. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
6 6 utility Calendar - Schedule Thu 08/27 4:15 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Schedule show cause hearing for failure to prosecute Related [+] (Wiggins, Carrie)
Related: [-] ument no. 5 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
5 5 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 06/02 4:21 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 6/12/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
4 4 court Summons Reissued Thu 04/30 2:30 PM
Summons Reissued on Karl Logistics, Inc. Date Issued 4/30/2020, Answer Due 6/1/2020 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Fri 02/28 1:31 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Zachary Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 3/9/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/21 4:36 PM
Summons Issued on Karl Logistics, Inc. Answer Due 02/20/2020 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 4:36 PM
Adversary case 20-00029 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Karl Logistics, Inc. (Fee Paid) (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]