Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00031
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:May 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
George G. Wooten, Jr.
160 Kissam Lane
Evergreen, NC 28438
Represented By
Benjamin E.F.B. Waller
Hendren, Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info
Jason L. Hendren
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca F. Redwine
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Christopher J. Waivers
White & Allen, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher J. Waivers
White & Allen, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 21, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/21 8:50 AM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-31 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
52 52 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/20 3:04 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph) **Corrective Entry: Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Joseph Zachary Frost, Benjamin E.F.B. Waller on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc., George G. Wooten Jr.** Modified on 5/21/2021 (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
51 51 order Compromise Tue 05/18 12:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 49