Original Case: 3:19-cv-00250

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv.pr-01062
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Nov 16, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 17, 2021 3:32 AM EST
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL INDIAN GAMING ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CENTER FOR AMERICAN INDIAN ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CONGRESS OF AMERICAN INDIANS
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIVE AMERICAN FINANCE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
ASSOCIATION ON AMERICAN INDIAN AFFAIRS
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
HABEMATOLEL POMO OF UPPER LAKE CONSUMER FINANCIAL SERVICES REGULATORY COMMISSION
Represented By
Bruce A. Finzen
ROBINS KAPLAN LLP
contact info
Sarah J. Auchterlonie
BROWNSTEIN HYATT FARBER SCHRECK, LLP
contact info
Brendan Johnson
ROBINS KAPLAN LLP
contact info
Timothy W. Billion
ROBINS KAPLAN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By
Hector Balderas
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NEW MEXICO
contact info
William H. Hurd
TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP
contact info
Tania Maestas
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NEW MEXICO
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Teresa Ann Wallbaum
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Brian C. Toth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant
JOSHUA LANDY
Defendant
SCOTT ASNER
Defendant - Appellant
AMBER JACKSON, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
VERONICA KROHN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JENNIFER BURNETT, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CAROL MUNOZ, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
AIMEE JACKSON-PENN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
SAM ICAY, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
IRIS PICTON, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KATHLEEN TREPPA, Treasurer of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
TRACEY TREPPA, Vice-Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Ann Wilkinson
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Miller Rosenthal
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Counsil; in her official capacity
Represented By
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Kosta S. Stojilkovic
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
James Rosenthal
WILKINSON WALSH & ESKOVITZ, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGE HENGLE
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUE COLLINS
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN PIKE
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TIFFANI MYERS
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELWOOD BUMBRAY
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIE ROSE
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHERRY BLACKBURN
Represented By
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info

GPO Nov 16 2021
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. [1001059260]. [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359]

Docket last updated: 11/17/2021 3:31 AM EST
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. Case manager: JeffNeal. 20-1062 JSN [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:27 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. James Rosenthal, Beth Wilkinson. 20-1062 JSN [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:17 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Kosta S. Stojilkovic re: change of address. 20-1062 JSN [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:19 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1063 with 20-1062 Copies to all parties. Mailed to: James Rosenthal, Beth Wilkinson, Jan Larson, Thomas Perrelli. [1000667545] 20-1062 20-1063 JSN [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:26 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/02/2020. Response Brief due 04/01/2020. Mailed to: James Rosenthal, Beth Wilkinson, Jan Larson, Thomas Perrelli. 20-1062 20-1063 JSN [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:29 PM]
Related: [-]