Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Case #: 3:19-cv-00250
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2019
Terminated:Oct 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2019 5:28 AM EDT
Amicus
HABEMATOLEL POMO OF UPPER LAKE CONSUMER FINANCIAL SERVICES REGULATORY COMMISSION
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP 410 17th Street Suite 2200 Denver
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Christine Ann Samsel
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck (co)
contact info
Defendant
Sam Icay
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aimee Jackson-Penn
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Iris Picton
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Landy
Represented By
Thomas John Perrelli
Jenner & Block Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Matthew Lloyd Haws
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Jan Amber Larson
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen Treppa
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sherry Treppa
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tracey Treppa
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Asner
Represented By
Thomas John Perrelli
Jenner & Block Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Matthew Lloyd Haws
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Jan Amber Larson
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Movant
Association on American Indian Affairs
Represented By
Jonodev Osceola Chaudhuri
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Nikia Lee Gray
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc)
contact info
Krystal Aspey Fleischmann
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Jeremy Arlan Lite
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Edward King Poor
Quarles & Brady Llp (il-Na)
contact info
Movant
National Center for American Indian Economic Development
Represented By
Jonodev Osceola Chaudhuri
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Nikia Lee Gray
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc)
contact info
Krystal Aspey Fleischmann
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Jeremy Arlan Lite
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Edward King Poor
Quarles & Brady Llp (il-Na)
contact info
Movant
National Congress of American Indians
Represented By
Jonodev Osceola Chaudhuri
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Nikia Lee Gray
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc)
contact info
Krystal Aspey Fleischmann
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Jeremy Arlan Lite
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Edward King Poor
Quarles & Brady Llp (il-Na)
contact info
Movant
National Indian Gaming Association
Represented By
Jonodev Osceola Chaudhuri
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Nikia Lee Gray
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc)
contact info
Krystal Aspey Fleischmann
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Jeremy Arlan Lite
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Edward King Poor
Quarles & Brady Llp (il-Na)
contact info
Movant
Native American Finance Officers Association
Represented By
Jonodev Osceola Chaudhuri
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Nikia Lee Gray
Quarles & Brady Llp (dc)
contact info
Krystal Aspey Fleischmann
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Jeremy Arlan Lite
Quarles & Brady Llp (az-Na)
contact info
Edward King Poor
Quarles & Brady Llp (il-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Willie Rose
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Pike
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffani Myers
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence Mwethuku
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hengle
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sue Collins
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elwood Bumbray
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherry Blackburn
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Hanes
Consumer Litigation Associates (richmond)
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Richard Moseley, Jr.
Terminated: 07/11/2019
Defendant
Upper Lake Processing Service, Inc.
Terminated: 07/15/2019
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Kosta Stojilkovic
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
James Rosenthal
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Rakesh Kilaru
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Eunnice Hyunhee Eun
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Silver Cloud Financial, Inc.
Terminated: 07/15/2019
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Kosta Stojilkovic
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
James Rosenthal
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Rakesh Kilaru
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Eunnice Hyunhee Eun
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
RM Partners, LLC
Terminated: 05/22/2019
Defendant
Mountain Summit Financial, Inc.
Terminated: 07/15/2019
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Kosta Stojilkovic
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
James Rosenthal
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Rakesh Kilaru
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Eunnice Hyunhee Eun
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Majestic Lake Financial, Inc.,
Terminated: 07/15/2019
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Kosta Stojilkovic
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
James Rosenthal
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Rakesh Kilaru
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Eunnice Hyunhee Eun
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Golden Valley Lending, Inc.
Terminated: 07/15/2019
Represented By
Matthew Randall Skanchy
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Kosta Stojilkovic
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
James Rosenthal
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Rakesh Kilaru
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Beth Wilkinson
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz (na)
contact info
Eunnice Hyunhee Eun
Wilkinson Walsh Eskovitz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
233 233 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/11 12:43 PM
ORDER (Granting Consent Motion to Amend Class Settlement Final Approval Order) that for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion231 , pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)(6). Paragraph 25 of the Court's Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class and Entering Final Judgment, (ECF No.230 ), is amended as follows: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. All other deadlines, including those for the Effective Dates of the Settlement in this case, remain unchanged by this Order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/11/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
232 232 3 pgs respoth Memorandum Tue 04/09 10:33 AM
Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion to Amend Class Settlement Final Approval Order to231 Consent MOTION Amend Class Settlement Final Approval Order re230 Order filed by Sherry Blackburn, Elwood Bumbray, Sue Collins, George Hengle, Lawrence Mwethuku, Tiffani Myers, Steven Pike, Willie Rose. (Bennett, Leonard)
Related: [-]
231 231 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Tue 04/09 10:32 AM
Consent MOTION Amend Class Settlement Final Approval Order re230 Order by Sherry Blackburn, Elwood Bumbray, Sue Collins, George Hengle, Lawrence Mwethuku, Tiffani Myers, Steven Pike, Willie Rose.(Bennett, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order