George Hengle v. Scott Asner
Original Case: 3:19-cv-00250
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv.pr-01063 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 17, 2021 3:33 AM EST |
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL INDIAN GAMING ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CENTER FOR AMERICAN INDIAN ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CONGRESS OF AMERICAN INDIANS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIVE AMERICAN FINANCE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
ASSOCIATION ON AMERICAN INDIAN AFFAIRS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
HABEMATOLEL POMO OF UPPER LAKE CONSUMER FINANCIAL SERVICES REGULATORY COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
STATE OF NEW MEXICO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAM ICAY, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
VERONICA KROHN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER BURNETT, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
CAROL MUNOZ, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
AMBER JACKSON, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
AIMEE JACKSON-PENN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
IRIS PICTON, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN TREPPA, Treasurer of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
TRACEY TREPPA, Vice-Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant
SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Counsil; in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
JOSHUA LANDY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SCOTT ASNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGE HENGLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUE COLLINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN PIKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
TIFFANI MYERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELWOOD BUMBRAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIE ROSE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHERRY BLACKBURN
|
Represented By
|
![]() PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. [1001059260]. [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2021 3:31 AM EST |
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |