Gencarelli v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas J Mcavoy |
Referred: | Christian F Hummel |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00085 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 21, 2020 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Coca-Cola Company
|
|
Plaintiff
James Gencarelli
510 Broadway (3G)
Saratoga Springs, NY 12966 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages
Terminated: 06/01/2020
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 29, 2021 | ||
102 | 102
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/29 1:32 PM
MANDATE of USCA issued on 9/29/2021 as to76 Notice of Appeal filed by James Gencarelli Petitioner-Appellant, pro se, requests leave to appeal an interlocutory order of the district court, opening 21-1062 He also appeals that same interlocutory order, opening 21-1068 Appellee moves to file a late opposition. This Court has determined that it lacks jurisdiction over the appeal because a final order has not been issued by the district court as contemplated by 28 U.S.C. § 1291. See Petrello v. White, 533F.3d 110, 113 (2d Cir. 2008). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petition for leave to appeal is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. It is further ORDERED that Appellees motion is DENIED as moot. (khr) |