Member Case
Lead case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:20-bk-50211
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2020
Terminated:Oct 21, 2021

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GenCanna Global, Inc
321 Venable Rd Ste 2
Winchester, KY 40391-9715
Represented By
James R. Irving
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, October 21, 2021
42 42 court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 10/21 3:08 PM
Final Decree, discharging Trustee, if applicable. CASE CLOSED. (bjp)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Close Case Thu 10/21 3:07 PM
Copy of Order to Close Case entered in 20-50133 - OGGUSA, Inc. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/07 9:23 AM
Receipt Number 312761, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1710) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/07 9:26 AM
Receipt Number 312762, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1711) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/07 9:30 AM
Receipt Number 312763, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1712) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/07 9:33 AM
Receipt Number 312764, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1713) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/07 9:35 AM
Receipt Number 312765, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1714) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 04/01 10:31 AM
Receipt Number 312754, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. # 1708) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Fri 03/26 10:19 AM
Receipt Number 312739, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. # 1561) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Fri 03/26 10:22 AM
Receipt Number 312740, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. # 1422) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 03/25 7:57 AM
Receipt Number 312733, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1690) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 03/25 8:05 AM
Receipt Number 312734, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1648) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 03/25 8:16 AM
Receipt Number 312735, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1307) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 03/25 8:23 AM
Receipt Number 312736, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1412) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 03/25 8:28 AM
Receipt Number 312737, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #1524) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Complaint applies to the other two jointly administered cases as well [ 20-50211 ; 20-50212 . (tgw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
40 40 misc Affidavit Wed 12/09 5:15 PM
Affidavit re Affidavit of Service of Angharad Bowdler of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC , filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (05014Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 39 Operating Report
Monday, November 30, 2020
39 39 misc Operating Report Mon 11/30 10:53 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 1 - 30, 2020 filed by OGG, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 25, 2020
38 38 misc Affidavit Sun 10/25 9:33 PM
Affidavit re Affidavit of Service of Marc Orfitelli of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC , filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (05014Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 37 Operating Report
Thursday, October 15, 2020
37 37 misc Operating Report Thu 10/15 6:24 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 1 through August 31, 2020 filed by OGG, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
36 36 misc Affidavit Fri 09/25 10:26 AM
Affidavit re Affidavit of Service of Marc Orfitelli of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC , filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (05014Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 35 Operating Report
Thursday, September 17, 2020
35 35 misc Operating Report Thu 09/17 11:09 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 1, 2020 through July 31, 2020 filed by OGG, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
34 34 misc Affidavit Mon 08/31 10:23 PM
Affidavit re Affidavit of Service of Marc Orfitelli of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC , filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (05014Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 33 Operating Report
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
33 33 misc Operating Report Wed 08/19 10:58 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 1, 2020 - June 30, 2020 filed by OGG, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 07/28 9:01 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (Doc #917) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Receipt Number 10478203, Fee Amount 181.00. [Motion applies to Debtors 20-50133 20-50211 , and 20-50212 (tgw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
32 32 misc Operating Report Thu 07/23 1:34 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 1, 2020 through May 31, 2020 filed by GenCanna Global, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
motion Relief from Stay Wed 07/08 6:15 PM
Receipt of Relief from Stay Filing Fee - $362.00 by KA. Receipt Number 312230. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
31 31 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held Wed 07/01 11:01 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 21, 2020
30 30 credclm Creditor Request for Notices Sun 06/21 8:05 AM
Creditor Request for Notices, filed on behalf of PRA Receivables Management, LLC. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
29 29 misc Operating Report Thu 06/18 9:34 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 1, 2020 through April 30, 2020 filed by GenCanna Global, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
28 28 misc Affidavit Fri 06/05 7:42 PM
Affidavit re Affidavit of Service of Marc Orfitelli of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC , filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (05014Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 27 Operating Report
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
27 27 misc Operating Report Tue 06/02 3:11 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 1 - 31, 2020 filed by GenCanna Global, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
26 26 misc Operating Report Mon 04/20 11:20 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 6, 2020 to February 29, 2020 filed by GenCanna Global, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/15 2:33 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief from Stay (Doc #573) filed in Lead Case Number 20-50133 Receipt Number 10353836, Fee Amount 181.00. [Motion applies to Debtors 20-50133 and 20-50211 ] (tgw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
25 25 court Notice re Non-Compliance Wed 03/04 1:34 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Notice is hereby given that Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs [ECF No. [23 and 24]] do(es) not resolve all deficiencies identified in the Order to File [ECF No. 9 ]. The following item(s) remain(s) due: Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor The document(s) filed do(es) not fully comply with the Order to File. Therefore, the deadline related to ECF No. 9 remains in effect. (alf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 01, 2020
24 24 9 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs Sun 03/01 11:10 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs, filed by GenCanna Global, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
23 23 46 pgs misc Schedules Sun 03/01 11:10 PM
Schedule(s) filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H,, filed by GenCanna Global, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
22 22 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/20 8:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel Hitchcock Filed by on behalf of Vulcan Materials Company - Mid South Division. (Hitchcock, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
21 21 2 pgs notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/14 9:03 AM
Notice of Filing of of Filing of Declaration In Support of Petition Filed by GenCanna Global, Inc Related [+]. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor GenCanna Global, Inc, 6 Discrepancy re Petition
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
20 20 2 pgs order Generic Tue 02/11 1:44 PM
Order Designating Individual Responsible to Perform Duties of the Debtor. (alf)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/11 10:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Todd A Farmer Filed by on behalf of Arrow Farms. (Farmer, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
18 18 misc Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty) Mon 02/10 12:51 PM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving Related [+]. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 3 Proposed Order Submitted filed by Debtor GenCanna Global, Inc, 8 Defective Order
17 17 3 pgs notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/10 12:47 PM
Notice of Filing of Special Resolutions of the Board of Directors of GenCanna Global, Inc. Filed by GenCanna Global, Inc Related [+]. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 2 Corporate Resolution filed by Debtor GenCanna Global, Inc, 7 Deficiency re Caption
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Corporate Resolution
Saturday, February 08, 2020
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/08/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, February 07, 2020
15 15 1 pgs audio Audio File Fri 02/07 2:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/6/2020 12:59:53 PM ]. File Size [ 27166 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:53:12 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Entry Fri 02/07 9:27 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of GenCanna Global USA, Inc.;GenCanna Global, Inc.; and Hemp Kentucky LLC. The docket in the chapter 11case of GenCanna Global USA, Inc., et al., Case No. 20-50133 grs, should beconsulted for all matters affecting the above-listed cases. (alf)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Joint Administration Fri 02/07 9:23 AM
Order GRANTING Motion For Joint Administration Related [+] (alf)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, February 06, 2020
12 12 1 pgs court Hearing Held Thu 02/06 4:03 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (lmu)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Joint Administration of GenCanna Global USA, Inc., GenCanna Global, Inc. and Hemp Kentucky LLC, filed by Debtor GenCanna Global, Inc
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/06 10:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
10 10 5 pgs order Operating Order Thu 02/06 9:32 AM
Chapter 11 Operating Order. (alf)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order File (BNC) Thu 02/06 9:27 AM
Order to File Schedules A,B, D-H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individuals Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. (alf)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Defective Order Thu 02/06 9:22 AM
Notice of Deficiency This Order is defective and the Court will not consider same until any deficiencies listed below have been corrected. The case caption is deficient. Case number is incorrect. No Division is listed in case caption. Filer must correct and refile ONLY the proposed Order using the event code Bankruptcy - Miscellaneous - Proposed Order Submitted. Related [+] (alf)
Related: [-] 3 Proposed Order Submitted filed by Debtor GenCanna Global, Inc
7 7 epo Deficiency re Caption Thu 02/06 9:20 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having considered the Corporate Resolution [ECF No. 2 ], filed herein on February 5, 2020, and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9004(b). It is ORDERED that said pleading may be STRICKEN from the record unless submitted with a proper case caption within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 2/13/2020.(alf)
Related: [-]
6 6 epo Discrepancy re Petition Thu 02/06 9:17 AM
Deficiency - Action Required It appears the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) record and the chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed on February 5, 2020, contain one or more of the following discrepancies: Other: The Employer Identification Number (EIN) is missing on the PDF Petition and does not appear in ECF It is ORDERED that the above listed discrepancy(ies) be corrected within 7 days of entry of this Order by filing either an amended PDF document if the error was contained within the original PDF, or by filing an affidavit stating what the correct information should be if the error was made by failing to enter, or incorrectly entering the information into the ECF system. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. The Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines was generated with the information in the ECF system. It is the responsibility of the attorney for debtor(s) to electronically file any correction(s) and serve all creditors if appropriate. Date due: 2/13/2020.(alf)
Related: [-]
5 5 epo Upload Creditor Matrix Thu 02/06 9:01 AM
Deficiency - Action Required A petition having been filed in this case, and the court finding that creditors were not uploaded into the CM/ECF system, It is ORDERED that counsel for the debtor(s) shall upload the creditor matrix file by docketing Bankruptcy - Creditor Maintenance within 3 working days from the date of this order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. (awd)
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs motion Joint Administration Thu 02/06 12:45 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of GenCanna Global USA, Inc., GenCanna Global, Inc. and Hemp Kentucky LLC, filed by GenCanna Global, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 2/6/2020 at 01:00 PM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Irving, James) Modified to correct mapping on 2/6/2020 (alf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
3 3 1 pgs misc Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty) Wed 02/05 11:46 PM
Defective Order. See ECF No. 8 Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving Related [+]. (Irving, James) Modified on 2/6/2020 (alf)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor GenCanna Global, Inc
2 2 3 pgs misc Corporate Resolution Wed 02/05 11:45 PM
Corporate Resolution, filed by GenCanna Global, Inc. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 02/05 11:43 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1717 Filed by GenCanna Global, Inc. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 02/05 11:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-50211 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 10247087, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1