Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04063
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2020
Terminated:Jun 24, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blue Star, Inc.
21950 Hoover
Warren, MI 48089
Represented By
Blue Star, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info
Michelle Stephenson
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Wed 06/24 2:41 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation
23 23 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/24 2:02 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 06/24 2:42 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4063 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/24 2:44 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4063 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
22 22 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/12 3:57 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
21 21 court Copy of Wed 06/10 5:02 PM
Copy of: Case Management Order Applicable To All Pending Preference Actions (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Withdrawal Wed 04/29 3:02 PM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Defendant Technical Logistic Corporation Related [+]. (Cole, Randal)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Appearance,19 Certificate of Service
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/29 1:40 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Technical Logistic Corporation Related [+]. (Cole, Randal) THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN WITHDRAWN PER PLEADING NUMBER 20 DATED 4/29/2020. Modified on 4/29/2020 (kwiacek)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Appearance
18 18 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/29 1:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Technical Logistic Corporation. (Cole, Randal) THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN WITHDRAWN PER PLEADING NUMBER 20 DATED 4/29/2020. Modified on 4/29/2020 (kwiacek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
17 17 court Copy of Thu 03/19 10:36 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
16 16 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 03/16 2:28 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate parents added to case: Blue Star, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Blue Star, Inc.. (Robinson, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
15 15 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/10 10:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Blue Star, Inc.. (Robinson, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 03/10 8:25 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 3/17/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Blue Star, Inc.
Monday, March 09, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/09 12:52 PM
Certificate of Service Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand Filed by Defendant Blue Star, Inc. Related [+]. (Leavitt, Michael)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint
12 12 utility Jury Demand Mon 03/09 12:49 PM
Jury Demand by Blue Star, Inc. Filed by Defendants Blue Star, Inc., Blue Star, Inc. Related [+]. (Leavitt, Michael)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint
11 11 misc Affirmative Defenses Mon 03/09 12:45 PM
Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant Blue Star, Inc.. (Leavitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/09 12:42 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Blue Star, Inc.. (Leavitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/21 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 11:16 AM
Summons Service Executed on Blue Star, Inc. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 10:22 AM
Summons Service Executed on Blue Star, Inc. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 02/11 10:14 AM
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 02/11 10:14 AM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Michelle Stephenson on behalf of Rivore Metals, LLC. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 02/08 11:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Sat 02/08 11:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on c/o Scott Krall Blue Star, Inc. 2/8/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Sat 02/08 11:51 AM
Summons Issued on c/o Scott Krall Blue Star, Inc. Answer Due 03/9/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 02/08 11:51 AM
Adversary case 20-04063 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against c/o Scott Krall Blue Star, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]