Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:19-bk-53795
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2019
Terminated:Nov 10, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Apr 29, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Rivore Metals, LLC
850 Stephenson Highway, Suite 200
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info
Elliot G. Crowder
contact info
Charles D. Bullock
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 11/10 11:46 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4065 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/10 11:47 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4065 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
order Final Decree and Case Closed Tue 11/10 2:36 PM
Final Decree: The bankruptcy estate has been fully administered. The bankruptcy court has decreed the chapter 11 case is closed. (ADI: MSK)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
313 313 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 11/09 4:52 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for July 2020 - September 2020 Filed by Liquidating Trustee CAG Management Services, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]