Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04067
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2020
Terminated:Jul 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scrapcom, Inc.
4310 Sir Robert Ave.
North Royalton, OH 44133
Represented By
Scrapcom, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Michelle Stephenson
contact info
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
16 16 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Tue 07/14 11:51 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation
15 15 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/14 11:27 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant with Proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 07/14 11:51 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4067 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/14 11:53 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4067 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
14 14 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/30 10:16 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
13 13 court Copy of Wed 06/10 5:06 PM
Copy of: Case Management Order Applicable To All Pending Preference Actions (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/17 9:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Scrapcom, Inc. Related [+]. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint,11 Statement of Corporate Ownership
11 11 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 04/17 9:20 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Scrapcom, Inc.. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/17 9:20 AM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Scrapcom, Inc.. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
9 9 court Copy of Thu 03/19 10:45 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/03 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
7 7 order stipulated order Tue 03/03 9:32 AM
Order Extending Deadline. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC
Monday, March 02, 2020
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 03/02 1:36 PM
Stipulation By and Between the Plaintiff and the Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/21 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 02/08 1:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Sat 02/08 1:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Scrapcom, Inc. 2/8/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Sat 02/08 1:04 PM
Summons Issued on Scrapcom, Inc. Answer Due 03/9/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 02/08 1:04 PM
Adversary case 20-04067 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Scrapcom, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]