Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04073
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Jul 15, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
North-South Trucking, Inc., Defendant
14335 S. Telegraph Rd.
Monroe, MI 48161
Represented By
North-South Trucking, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info
Michelle Stephenson
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
16 16 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Wed 07/15 4:53 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 07/15 4:53 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4073 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/15 4:54 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4073 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
15 15 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/14 8:59 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Rivore Metals, LLC and North-South Trucking, Inc. . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
14 14 answer Response Tue 07/07 11:06 AM
Response to Related [+] with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 12 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case
13 13 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/07 11:00 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
12 12 order Show Cause for Dismissal of Case Mon 07/06 11:42 AM
Order Requiring Plaintiff To Show Cause, In Writing, Why This Adversary Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed, For Lack Of Prosecution. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
11 11 court Copy of Wed 06/10 5:09 PM
Copy of: Case Management Order Applicable To All Pending Preference Actions (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/17 9:18 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant North-South Trucking, Inc. Related [+]. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-] 8 Answer to Complaint,9 Statement of Corporate Ownership
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 04/17 9:17 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant North-South Trucking, Inc.. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/17 9:15 AM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by North-South Trucking, Inc.. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 court Copy of Thu 03/19 10:51 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
6 6 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 03/13 9:45 AM
Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to Answer Complaint to 4/17/202 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Defendant North-South Trucking, Inc.
Thursday, March 12, 2020
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 03/12 4:42 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC and Defendant North-South Trucking, Inc. Re: Order Extending Deadline For Defendant To Answer Complaint . Filed by Defendant North-South Trucking, Inc.. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/11 8:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 8:49 AM
Summons Service Executed on North-South Trucking, Inc. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 8:47 AM
Summons Issued on North-South Trucking, Inc. Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 8:47 AM
Adversary case 20-04073 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against North-South Trucking, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]