Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04075
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:May 28, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Arlen Associates, L.L.C., Defendant
48085 Colony Farms Circle
Plymouth, MI 48170
Represented By
Arlen Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 28, 2020
13 13 order Default Judgment Thu 05/28 11:41 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 12 Motion For Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 05/28 11:42 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4075 : Granted by Default Judgment. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/28 11:43 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4075 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 05/28 4:58 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 5/28/2020 by the United States Postal Service to: Arlene Associates, LLC, c/o Robert D. Arlene, Registered Agent, 48085 Colony Farms Circle, Plymouth, MI 48170. Related [+] (sms)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, May 04, 2020
12 12 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/04 1:44 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 05/01 1:39 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Arlen Associates, L.L.C. - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/15/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
10 10 court Copy of Thu 03/19 10:57 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/13 1:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Arlen Associates, L.L.C. 3/13/2020 (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Reissued Summons (auto) Fri 03/13 11:14 AM
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Fri 03/13 11:14 AM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Elliot G. Crowder on behalf of Rivore Metals, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Fri 03/13 10:10 AM
Order Prescribing the Time for Service of Response to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Served on Defendant Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 5
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Fri 03/13 10:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 3/13/2020 by the United States Postal Service to Arlen Associates, LLC, C/O Robert D. Arlen, Registered Agent, 48085 Colony Farms Circle, Plymouth, MI 48170. Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Generic Motion
Thursday, March 12, 2020
5 5 motion generic Motion Thu 03/12 10:35 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Prescribing the Time for Service of Response to Complaint Served on a Foreign Defendant Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7004 and 7012(a); with Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/21 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 10:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on Arlen Associates, L.L.C. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 10:51 AM
Summons Issued on Arlen Associates, L.L.C. Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 10:51 AM
Adversary case 20-04075 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Arlen Associates, L.L.C.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]