Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04076
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:May 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Applied Partners, Defendant
770 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10021
Represented By
Applied Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 11, 2020
10 10 order Default Judgment Mon 05/11 4:37 PM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 05/11 4:38 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4076 : Granted by Default Judgment. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/11 4:39 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4076 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Mon 05/11 4:50 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 5/11/2020 by the United States Postal Service to the non-ECF Participant- Defendant at His/Her Respective Address Appearing in the Records of the Court. Related [+] (jhawk)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, May 04, 2020
9 9 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/04 11:50 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/20 9:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Applied Partners - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/4/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
7 7 court Copy of Thu 03/19 10:59 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) Re:5 Clerk's Entry Of Default (kcm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 15, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/16 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, March 13, 2020
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/13 12:45 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Applied Partners Default Judgment Motion due by 3/27/2020. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/21 3:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 11:05 AM
Summons Service Executed on Applied Partners 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 11:03 AM
Summons Issued on Applied Partners Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 11:03 AM
Adversary case 20-04076 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Applied Partners. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]